This case was last updated from PACER on 01/10/2018 at 02:40:31 (UTC).

Brumage v. Biomet Orthopedics LLC et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Brumage filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Biomet Orthopedics LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Robert L Miller, Jr and Michael G Gotsch, Sr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00012

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert L Miller, Jr

Referral Judge

Michael G Gotsch, Sr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michele S Brumage

Defendants

Biomet Orthopedics LLC

Biomet US Reconstruction LLC

Biomet Manufacturing Corp

Biomet Inc

Does 1-15

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Sill PHV

Attorney at Sill Law Group

14005 N Eastern Ave

Edmond, OK 73013

Defendant Attorney

Michael F Smith

Attorney at McAfee & Taft-TULSA

Two West 2Nd St, Suite 1100, Williams Tower Ii

Tulsa, OK 74103

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-01351. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#9

(#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern District of Indiana for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ml) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER Granting re #7 Defendants Biomet (collectively) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; and permits defendants Biomet to file its answer or to otherwise respond to allegations in the removed state court petition ten (10) days after this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana and consolidated for pretrial proceedings in In re: Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Case No. 2391, as fully set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable Lee R. West on 12/27/2017. (kb) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

7 #1

Exhibit 1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action

#7

(#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action)(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

#6

(#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet US Reconstruction LLC . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#5

(#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet Manufacturing Corp . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#4

(#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet Orthopedics LLC . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Biomet Inc . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6-Oklahoma County Docket Sheet

1 #5

Exhibit 5-Summons Biomet, Inc

1 #4

Exhibit 4-Summons Biomet Orthopedics LLC

1 #3

Exhibit 3-Summons Biomet US Reconstruction LLC

1 #2

Exhibit 2-Summons Biomet Manufacturing Corp

1 #1

Exhibit 1-Petition

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2017-5278 filed by Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons Biomet Manufacturing Corp, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons Biomet Orthopedics LLC, #5 Exhibit 5-Summons Biomet, Inc, #6 Exhibit 6-Oklahoma County Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Western; Case Number 5:17-cv-01351. Original file and docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to District of Northern District of Indiana for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Robert L Miller Jr. Signed by Clerk of the Panel. (ml) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER Granting re #7 Defendants Biomet (collectively) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint; and permits defendants Biomet to file its answer or to otherwise respond to allegations in the removed state court petition ten (10) days after this case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Indiana and consolidated for pretrial proceedings in In re: Biomet M2a Magnum Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation, MDL Case No. 2391, as fully set forth in Order. Signed by Honorable Lee R. West on 12/27/2017. (kb) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, by Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action)(Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2614912. (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet US Reconstruction LLC . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet Manufacturing Corp . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Biomet Orthopedics LLC . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by Biomet Inc . (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Michael F Smith on behalf of Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC (Smith, Michael) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Oklahoma County, case number CJ-2017-5278 filed by Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Biomet Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Petition, #2 Exhibit 2-Summons Biomet Manufacturing Corp, #3 Exhibit 3-Summons Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, #4 Exhibit 4-Summons Biomet Orthopedics LLC, #5 Exhibit 5-Summons Biomet, Inc, #6 Exhibit 6-Oklahoma County Docket Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(ml) [Transferred from Oklahoma Western on 1/9/2018.] (Entered: 12/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) STATE COURT COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Biomet Inc, Biomet Manufacturing Corp, Biomet Orthopedics LLC, Biomet US Reconstruction LLC, Does, filed by Michele S Brumage.(jld) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less