This case was last updated from PACER on 01/01/2019 at 07:34:05 (UTC).

BROWN v. WETZEL et al

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 BROWN filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against WETZEL. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard A. Lanzillo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00347

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard A. Lanzillo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JERMEL T. BROWN

Marienville, PA 16239

Defendants

JADLOCKI

JASON G. COCHRAN

ERIN W. IRELAND

DOUGLAS M. BEATY

THOMAS MURIN

DEREK F. OBERLANDER

MICHAEL D. OVERMYER

MILLER

R. WONDERLING

CONSTANZO

JOHN E. WETZEL

JOHN W. SAWTELLE

KEVIN C. COWAN

HASPER

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) US Marshal's Return as to Order, Complaint, Notice and Waiver executed on 12/18/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER ENTERED that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to the defendant as directed by the plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/6/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

5 #1

Envelope

#5

(#5) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JERMEL T. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

#4

RESTRICTED

3 #14

Exhibits U-X

3 #13

Exhibits P-T

3 #12

Exhibits M-O

3 #11

Exhibit L

3 #10

Exhibit K

3 #9

Exhibit I

3 #8

Exhibit H

3 #7

Exhibit G

3 #6

Exhibit F

3 #5

Exhibit E

3 #4

Exhibit D

3 #2

Exhibit B

3 #1

Exhibit A

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) US Marshal's Return as to Order, Complaint, Notice and Waiver executed on 12/18/2018. (ksa) (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Service copies placed in US Marshal box (dm) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER ENTERED that the Marshal is directed to mail a copy of the complaint, notice of lawsuit, request for waiver of service of summons, waiver, and this order to the defendant as directed by the plaintiff. Costs shall be advanced by the government. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 12/6/2018. (dm) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Authorization permitting withdrawal of prison account funds to pay filing fee by JERMEL T. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (jv) (Entered: 11/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CONSENT to Trial/Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge OR District Judge Option, by JERMEL T. BROWN. (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) COMPLAINT against DOUGLAS M. BEATY, JASON G. COCHRAN, CONSTANZO, KEVIN C. COWAN, HASPER, ERIN W. IRELAND, JADLOCKI, MILLER, THOMAS MURIN, DEREK F. OBERLANDER, MICHAEL D. OVERMYER, JOHN W. SAWTELLE, JOHN E. WETZEL, R. WONDERLING Filing fee $400, ), filed by JERMEL T. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit K, #11 Exhibit L, #12 Exhibits M-O, #13 Exhibits P-T, #14 Exhibits U-X) (ksa) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM and ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and the Clerk is directed to file the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard A. Lanzillo on 11/7/2018. (Attachments: #1 Authorization or Withdrawal of Action) (dm) Modified on 11/8/2018 to add additional docket text. (ksa) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • RECEIVED USM-285's for all defendants. (sdp) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by JERMEL T. BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge or District Judge Option, #2 Complaint, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibits M-O, #16 Exhibits P-T, #17 Exhibits U-X, #18 Envelope Motion to Proceed IFP mailed in, #19 Envelope Complaint and Exhibits mailed in) (ksa) (Entered: 11/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less