This case was last updated from PACER on 06/17/2020 at 06:52:52 (UTC).

Brown v. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 10/19/2017 Brown filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Walter E. Johnson, Mark H. Cohen and Michael L. Brown. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-04170

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Walter E. Johnson

Presiding Judges

Mark H. Cohen

Michael L. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Alicia Brown

Defendants and Counter Claimants

General Motors, LLC

Nexus Business Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Mitchell L. Feldman

Attorney at Mitchell L. Feldman, Esq., P.A.

400 Colony Square, Suite 200, 1201 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30361

Mitchell Lloyd Feldman

Attorney at Mitchell L. Feldman, Esq., P.A.

400 Colony Square, Suite 200, 1201 Peachtree St., Ne

Atlanta, GA 30361

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Deepa N. Subramanian

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Luke Donohue

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. - Atl

Suite 4800, 191 Peachtree Street, N.E.

Atlanta, GA 30303

Carrie A. Valdez

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP-OH

Suite 2000, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Eric Leroy Barnum

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP - GA

1170 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30309

Porsche D. Austin

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler, LLP - GA

1170 Peachtree Street Ne, Suite 2400

Atlanta, GA 30309

 

Court Documents

#24

(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Alicia Brown. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

#22

(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant General Motors, LLC's Initial Disclosures by General Motors, LLC.(Subramanian, Deepa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

#21

(#21) NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#20

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/12/2018. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 4/13/2018. Motions for summary judgment no later than 8/13/18. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018 or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#19

(#19) ORDER for Service of #18 Non-Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#18

(#19) ORDER for Service of #18 Non-Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#16

(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/12/2018. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 4/13/2018. Motions for summary judgment no later than 8/13/18. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018 or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

#8

(#9) NOTICE of Supplement by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(Austin, Porsche) Modified on 2/14/2018 to edit text (jpa). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

#7

(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nexus Business Solutions Group Ltd. for Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (Austin, Porsche) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

#6

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Motors, LLC Answer due 2/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/23/18. (klb) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

5 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#5

(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Motors, LLC Answer due 2/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/23/18. (klb) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alicia Brown. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC waiver mailed on 12/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#3

(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 10/23/2017)

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 10/23/2017)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#8) Defendant Nexus Business Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 7/12/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM against Alicia Brown with Jury Demand by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC.(Austin, Porsche) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/12/2018)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson terminated from case. (jpa) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING #24 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii). (jpa) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) STIPULATION of Dismissal (Joint Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice) by Alicia Brown. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 04/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAPPROVAL by Clerks Office re: #23 APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie A. Valdez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781645). Attorney Eric Leroy Barnum added appearing on behalf of Nexus Business Solutions, LLC (jkm) (Entered: 04/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #18 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION, submitted to District Judge Michael L. Brown. (jpa) (Entered: 04/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) APPLICATION for Admission of Carrie A. Valdez Pro Hac Vice (Application fee $ 150, receipt number 113E-7781645)by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Barnum, Eric) (Entered: 03/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendant General Motors, LLC's Initial Disclosures by General Motors, LLC.(Subramanian, Deepa) (Entered: 03/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE to Parties Regarding Summary Judgment Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) SCHEDULING ORDER: re: #16 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Discovery ends on 7/12/2018. Motions under Local Rule 7.1(A)(2) including motions to amend pleadings due by 4/13/2018. Motions for summary judgment no later than 8/13/18. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 8/13/2018 or within thirty days from a final ruling on any motion for summary judgment that is not dispositive of all claims advanced by the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER for Service of #18 Non-Final Report and Recommendation, by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 3/16/18. (klb) (Entered: 03/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Supplement by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Employment Agreement)(Austin, Porsche) Modified on 2/14/2018 to edit text (jpa). (Entered: 02/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant Nexus Business Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand ( Discovery ends on 7/12/2018.), COUNTERCLAIM against Alicia Brown with Jury Demand by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC.(Austin, Porsche) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nexus Business Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Nexus Business Solutions Group Ltd. for Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (Austin, Porsche) (Entered: 02/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Michael L Brown. Judge Mark H. Cohen no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:17-cv-04170-MLB. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (tcc) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. General Motors, LLC Answer due 2/15/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Walter E. Johnson on 1/23/18. (klb) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by General Motors, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Subramanian, Deepa) (Entered: 01/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Alicia Brown. Nexus Business Solutions, LLC waiver mailed on 12/14/2017, answer due 2/12/2018. (Feldman, Mitchell) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Nexus Business Solutions, LLC. (eop) (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Alicia Brown. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7456860.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 10/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NEXUS BUSINESS SOLUTIONS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where General Motors, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Porsche D. Austin

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carrie A. Valdez