This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:43:33 (UTC).

BROWN v. JOHNSON & JOHNSON et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2018 BROWN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against JOHNSON JOHNSON. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Lois H. Goodman and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-17183

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Lois H. Goodman

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OZZIE BROWN

Defendants

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON

IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.

JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY

LUZENAC AMERICA, INC.

In Re

JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS F. CUFFIE

Attorney at COUNSERL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

3080M Camp Bellton Road

Atlanta, GA 30311

Defendant Attorneys

SUSAN M. SHARKO

Attorney at DRINKER, BIDDLE & REATH, LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932-1047

JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI

Attorney at DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

600 Campus Drive

Florham Park, NJ 07932

SCOTT A. JAMES

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Street, Suite 3400

Houston, TX 77002-2926

KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER

Attorney at COUNSEL NOT ADMITTED TO USDC-NJ BAR

600 Travis Ste 3400

Houston, TX 77002

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

#3

(#3) Notice of Filing Short Form Complaint, for member case 2738, by OZZIE BROWN (CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 #1

Appendix ADDENDUM TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9240946) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OZZIE BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ADDENDUM TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by JULIE LYNN TERSIGNI on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (TERSIGNI, JULIE) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by SUSAN M. SHARKO on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (SHARKO, SUSAN) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by SCOTT A. JAMES on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (JAMES, SCOTT) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by KATHLEEN A. FRAZIER on behalf of JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC. (FRAZIER, KATHLEEN) (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Filing Short Form Complaint, d.e. #3 , filed by Thomas Cuffie on 12/24/2018 was filed in the incorrect case. PLEASE REFILE in the LEAD Case (16-2738) NOT the member case. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (km) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing Short Form Complaint, for member case 2738, by OZZIE BROWN (CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Member Case Direct File on 12/13/2018, for MDL 2738 Party JOHNSON & JOHNSON TALCUM POWDER PRODUCTS MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION added. (jmh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER COMPANIES, INC., JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER PRODUCTS COMPANY, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER, INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jmh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • Judge Freda L. Wolfson and Magistrate Judge Lois H. Goodman added. (jmh) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against JOHNSON & JOHNSON ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9240946) with JURY DEMAND, filed by OZZIE BROWN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix ADDENDUM TO SHORT FORM COMPLAINT, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET)(CUFFIE, THOMAS) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMERYS TALC AMERICA, INC. ("IMERYS TALC") is a litigant

Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS F. CUFFIE