This case was last updated from PACER on 08/25/2018 at 07:09:01 (UTC).

Brown v. Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert N. Chatigny. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01084

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert N. Chatigny

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Melvin Brown

Defendant

Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Peter Newton Freiberg

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

James R. Denlea

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

Jeffrey I. Carton

Attorney at Denlea & Carton LLP

2 Westchester Park Drive, Suite 410

White Plains, NY 10604

Defendant Attorneys

Megan E. Bryson

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP - CT

1010 Washington Blvd., 6Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901

Carol S. Doty

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan LLP

1010 Washington Blvd.

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memo of Law by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC.Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Doty, Carol) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC.Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Doty, Carol) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Carol S. Doty on behalf of Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC (Doty, Carol) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

#11

(#11) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 22, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC. (Bryson, Megan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Bryson on behalf of Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC (Bryson, Megan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

#9

(#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Brown. Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. (Denlea, James) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Denlea on behalf of Melvin Brown (Denlea, James) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey I. Carton* *Denlea & Carton LLP* *2 Westchester Park Drive Suite 410* *White Plains, NY 10604*. (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Melvin Brown, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Melvin Brown, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 06/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#5

(#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#4

(#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#3

(#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2018. Discovery due by 12/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Melvin Brown (Freiberg, Peter) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CTDC-4881690.), filed by Melvin Brown.(Carton, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2018 to correct filed against parties(Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 06/26/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Memo of Law by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC.Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Doty, Carol) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC.Responses due by 9/12/2018 (Doty, Carol) (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Carol S. Doty on behalf of Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC (Doty, Carol) (Entered: 07/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Answer deadline updated for Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC to 8/22/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER granting #11 Consent Motion for Extension of Time to 8/22/2018 to file a responsive pleading. Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 7/24/2018. (Rickevicius, L.) (Entered: 07/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MOTION for Extension of Time until August 22, 2018 to File Responsive Pleading by Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC. (Bryson, Megan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Megan E. Bryson on behalf of Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC (Bryson, Megan) (Entered: 07/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Melvin Brown. Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC served on 7/2/2018, answer due 7/23/2018. (Denlea, James) (Entered: 07/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by James R. Denlea on behalf of Melvin Brown (Denlea, James) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Greenwich Woods Rehabilitation LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Jeffrey I. Carton* *Denlea & Carton LLP* *2 Westchester Park Drive Suite 410* *White Plains, NY 10604*. (Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Melvin Brown, #2 Notice of Appearance filed by Melvin Brown, #3 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #4 Electronic Filing Order, #5 Standing Protective Order Signed by Clerk on 06/27/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Robert N. Chatigny on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 8/25/2018. Discovery due by 12/26/2018. Dispositive Motions due by 1/30/2019. Signed by Clerk on 06/26/2018.(Hernandez, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Judge Robert N. Chatigny added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Newton Freiberg on behalf of Melvin Brown (Freiberg, Peter) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • Request for Clerk to issue summons as to All Defendants. (Carton, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2018 to correct party(Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number CTDC-4881690.), filed by Melvin Brown.(Carton, Jeffrey) Modified on 6/27/2018 to correct filed against parties(Hushin, Z.). (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.