This case was last updated from PACER on 11/18/2018 at 07:35:07 (UTC).

Brown v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Brown filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William T. Moore, Jr, G. R. Smith and James E. Graham. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00224

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William T. Moore, Jr

Referral Judges

G. R. Smith

James E. Graham

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Doris Brown

Defendants

John Does 1-10

Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dustin W. Hamilton

Attorney at Dozier Law Firm LLC

401 Mall Blvd, Suite 103E

Savannah, GA 31406

Defendant Attorney

James T. Hankins, III

Attorney at Goodman, McGuffey, Lindsey & Johnson, LLP

3340 Peachtree Rd., Ne, Suite 2100

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

9 #2

Civil Trial Information

9 #1

Joint Status Instructions

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2018. Discovery due by 2/6/2019. Motions due by 3/8/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/18/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/17/2019. Status Report due by 12/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Instructions, #2 Civil Trial Information) (jrb) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

#8

(#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

6 #2

Exhibit "B" - Redacted Demand Letter

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Filing by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Exhibits A and B to DFT Dollar Tree's Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" - Redacted Demand Letter)(Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. State Court Motions due by 9/29/2018. (wwp) Modified on 9/20/2018 (wwp). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

2 #1

Notice

#2

(#2) General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #3

*Restricted*

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV1801302. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2450197), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Complaint, #3 Exhbit 2 State Complaint)(wwp) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SCHEDULING ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2018. Discovery due by 2/6/2019. Motions due by 3/8/2019. Expert Witness Report (Plaintiff) due by 12/18/2018. Expert Witness Report (defendant) due by 1/17/2019. Status Report due by 12/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge James E. Graham on 10/24/18. (Attachments: #1 Joint Status Instructions, #2 Civil Trial Information) (jrb) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. of Pending Motions in State Court (Hankins, James) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • Case Reassigned to Magistrate Judge James E. Graham per order in case 4:18MC-16. Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith no longer assigned to the case. (jrb) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Filing by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Exhibits A and B to DFT Dollar Tree's Petition for Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit "B" - Redacted Demand Letter)(Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Disclosure Statement pursuant to Local Rule 7.1.1 by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.. (Hankins, James) (Entered: 09/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE to all counsel of record that a #1 Notice of Removal was filed in the Southern District of Georgia. State Court Motions due by 9/29/2018. (wwp) Modified on 9/20/2018 (wwp). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) General ORDER pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f). Signed by Magistrate Judge G. R. Smith on 9/19/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice) (wwp) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. from State Court of Chatham County, case number STCV1801302. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113J-2450197), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 State Complaint, #3 Exhbit 2 State Complaint)(wwp) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less