This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2018 at 07:24:40 (UTC).

Brown et al v. Piedmonte et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2018 Brown filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Piedmonte. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is John J Tuchi. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02585

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John J Tuchi

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael D Brown Investments LLC

Michael D Brown

Defendants

John A Piedmonte

Unknown Piedmonte

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey J Goulder

Stinson Leonard Street Llp - Phoenix, Az, 1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4584

Javier Torres

Stinson Leonard Street Llp - Phoenix, Az, 1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2100

Phoenix, AZ 85004-4584

Defendant Attorneys

Zachary Ryan Fort

Attorney at Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Seth Troy Goertz

Attorney at Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

Geoffrey S Kercsmar

Attorney at Kercsmar & Feltus PLLC

7150 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 285

Scottsdale, AZ 85251

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) ORDER granting the #9 Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John A. Piedmonte shall have until September 12, 2018, to file his responsive pleading to the Complaint (Doc. #1 -3). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Michigan, as expeditiously as is practicable and close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/28/2018. (ATD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

9 #1

Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer and Order Granting

#9

(#9) STIPULATION Stipulation to Transfer Venue and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading by John A Piedmonte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer and Order Granting Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE re: Service by Michael D Brown, Michael D Brown Investments LLC re: #7 Order . (Goulder, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/17/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

#6

(#6) * Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) * Modified to correct document linkage on 8/17/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Michael D Brown Investments LLC. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

#2

(#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15846533. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2585-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

1 #3

Exhibit

1 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-009334. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15846533 filed by John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2018
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in the Eastern District of Michigan. New Case Number: 2:18-cv-12699. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • Remark: Case transferred to the Eastern District of Michigan by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ATD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER granting the #9 Stipulation to Transfer Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404 and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant John A. Piedmonte shall have until September 12, 2018, to file his responsive pleading to the Complaint (Doc. #1 -3). The Clerk of Court is directed to transfer this action to the U.S. District Court for Eastern District of Michigan, as expeditiously as is practicable and close this matter. Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/28/2018. (ATD) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION Stipulation to Transfer Venue and Stipulation to Extend Deadline for Responsive Pleading by John A Piedmonte. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Granting Stipulation to Transfer and Order Granting Extension of Time to File A Responsive Pleading)(Kercsmar, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE re: Service by Michael D Brown, Michael D Brown Investments LLC re: #7 Order . (Goulder, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that motions to dismiss pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 (b) and motions to strike pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) are discouraged if the defect that would be the subject of the motion can be cured by filing an amended pleading. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this Order on Defendants. (See attached Order). Signed by Judge John J Tuchi on 8/17/18. (JAMA) (Entered: 08/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) * Additional Attachments to Main Document re: #1 Notice of Removal Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) * Modified to correct document linkage on 8/17/2018 (LAD). (Entered: 08/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to Michael D Brown Investments LLC. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #1 Notice of Removal filed by John A Piedmonte. Document is illegible. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please correct the following: Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet is blank. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please refile corrected document. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-15846533. This case has been assigned to the Honorable John J Tuchi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-2585-PHX-JJT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • ***STATE COURT RECORD RECEIVED***SERVICE EXECUTED: Certificate of Service re: Summons, Certification of Complex Case, Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration and Complaint upon John A Piedmonte on 7/17/2018 (original filed in Maricopa County Superior Court on 7/24/2018). (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-009334. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-15846533 filed by John A Piedmonte. (Kercsmar, Geoffrey) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit)(MFR) (Entered: 08/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.