This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/10/2018 at 07:43:34 (UTC).

BROOKS v. GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2018 BROOKS filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are James R. Sweeney II and Tim A. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03152

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James R. Sweeney II

Referral Judge

Tim A. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Robin Brooks

Defendant

GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason R. Ramsland

Attorney at BALL EGGLESTON

201 Main Street, Suite 810

Lafayette, IN 47902

Defendant Attorneys

Steven F. Pockrass

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Theresa Renee Parish

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

Michelle R. Maslowski

Attorney at OGLETREE DEAKINS NASH SMOAK & STEWART, P.C. (Indianapolis)

111 Monument Circle, Suite 4600

Indianapolis, IN 46204

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Proposed Summons

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

#12

#13

#15

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ANSWER to #1 Complaint , filed by GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC.(Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN TENDERED, filed by Defendant GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC and Plaintiff, Robin Brooks. (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/6/2018 09:00 AM in Telephonic before Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker. Parties shall attend by counsel. The information needed by counsel of record to participate in this telephonic conference will be provided by separate notification. If a proposed Case Management Plan ("CMP") has not yet been filed, the parties are ordered to confer prior to the initial pretrial conference and prepare a proposed CMP. See Order for additional information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Tim A. Baker on 11/5/2018.(SWM) (Entered: 11/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Parties' First Extension of Time, filed by Defendant GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) NOTICE of Appearance by Theresa Renee Parish on behalf of Defendant GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Parish, Theresa) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle R. Maslowski on behalf of Defendant GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Maslowski, Michelle) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Steven F. Pockrass on behalf of Defendant GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Pockrass, Steven) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (DWH) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC. (Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ***PLEASE DISREGARD - DOCKETED IN ERROR*** Proposed Summons submitted for issuance by the clerk as to ROBIN BROOKS. (Ramsland, Jason) Modified on 10/16/2018 (DWH). (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) CLERK'S NOTICE - The plaintiff has tendered a summons that is not in compliance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(a)(1)(C), which requires a summons to state the name and address of the attorney of plaintiff... Plaintiff has tendered a summons without the contact information for counsel. The Clerk cannot issue a summons that is not properly completed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(b). Plaintiff is directed to resubmit properly completed summons for issuance. (BRR) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (DJH) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R. Ramsland on behalf of Plaintiff Robin Brooks. (Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT , Collective Action against GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC, filed by Robin Brooks. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5104896) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Ramsland, Jason) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GPM INVESTMENTS, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jason R Ramsland