This case was last updated from PACER on 11/27/2018 at 08:17:52 (UTC).

Brooks v. City of Millington et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2018 Brooks filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against City of Millington. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charmiane G. Claxton and Jon Phipps McCalla. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02667

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Charmiane G. Claxton

Presiding Judge

Jon Phipps McCalla

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Brooks

Defendants

City of Millington

Gary Graves

Tommy White

Bryan Childress

Not Classified By Court

Donna Russell

Memphis, TN 38103

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William C. Sessions, III

Attorney at Heaton and Moore, P.C.

100 N. Main Building, Suite 3400

Memphis, TN 38103

Defendant Attorneys

Edward J. McKenney, Jr.

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC - East Memphis

6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

William J. Wyatt

Attorney at HARRIS SHELTON HANOVER WALSH, PLLC - East Memphis

6060 Primacy Parkway, Suite 100

Memphis, TN 38119

 

Court Documents

14 #1

Memorandum

#14

(#14) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Gary Graves. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

#13

(#13) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/01/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by City of Millington. (McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#10

(#10) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 10/30/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Wyatt on behalf of Bryan Childress, City of Millington, Gary Graves (Wyatt, William) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Millington.(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#6

(#6) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 10/30/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Summons Chancery Court Summonses

1 #1

Supplement Chancery Court Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Millington, Bryan Childress, Gary Graves from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1128-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2890328), filed by City of Millington, Bryan Childress, Gary Graves. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Chancery Court Complaint, #2 Summons Chancery Court Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER terminating #12 Motion for Protective Order **TEXT ORDER ONLY**. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/1/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Gary Graves. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum)(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 11/01/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 11/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Joint MOTION for Protective Order by City of Millington. (McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jon Phipps McCalla on 10/30/2018. (jjf) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SETTING LETTER: Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 on 10/30/2019. (jrs) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • (#9) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 10/30/2018. William C. Sessions, III appeared for the Plaintiff. Edward J. McKenney appeared for the Defense. Jury Trial is set for Monday, 11/18/2019 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Trial is estimated to last 2-3 days. Pretrial Conference is set for Friday, 11/8/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order is due by 4:30 PM on 10/30/2019. (Court Reporter: Lisa Mayo) (jrs) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by William J. Wyatt on behalf of Bryan Childress, City of Millington, Gary Graves (Wyatt, William) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by City of Millington.(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SETTING LETTER: A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for Tuesday, 10/30/2018 at 9:30 AM before Judge Jon Phipps McCalla. Counsel for the Plaintiff shall initiate the conference call prior to dialing Judge McCalla's chambers at 901-495-1291. (jrs) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Judge Jon Phipps McCalla and Magistrate Judge Charmiane G. Claxton added. (jae) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by City of Millington, Bryan Childress, Gary Graves from Shelby County Chancery Court, case number CH-18-1128-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2890328), filed by City of Millington, Bryan Childress, Gary Graves. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Chancery Court Complaint, #2 Summons Chancery Court Summonses, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McKenney, Edward) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less