This case was last updated from PACER on 02/20/2018 at 07:01:45 (UTC).

Brooks Sports, Inc. v. Anta (China) Co., Ltd.

Case Summary

On 12/22/2017 Brooks Sports, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Anta China Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Liam O'Grady and Theresa Carroll Buchanan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:17-CV-01458

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Virginia Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

Referral Judge

Theresa Carroll Buchanan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brooks Sports, Inc.

Defendant

Anta (China) Co., Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Craig Crandall Reilly

Attorney at Law Office of Craig C. Reilly

111 Oronoco St

Alexandria, VA 22314

 

Court Documents

15 #1

Notice

#15

(#15) Summons Issued as to Anta (China) Co., Ltd.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#14

(#14) Proposed Summons by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#13

(#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 01/31/2018. (jlan) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

#12

(#12) Notice of Hearing Date set for February 2, 2018 re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

11 #1

Affidavit Declaration of Marc Levy

#11

(#11) Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process filed by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Marc Levy)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

10 #1

Proposed Order

#10

(#10) MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E. Danley and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 01/10/2018. (jlan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E. Danley and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5882001. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/2/2018. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#7

(#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/2/2018. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A. Shewmake and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5876402. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#4

(#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc C. Levy and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5876401. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

#3

(#3) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 2750754, 1683840. (jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

#2

(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Brooks Sports, Inc. (jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Anta (China) Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5870544) filed by Brooks Sports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Summons Issued as to Anta (China) Co., Ltd.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Proposed Summons by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 01/31/2018. (jlan) (Entered: 02/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Buchanan. #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process (clar, ) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process . Motion Hearing set for 2/2/2018 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (clar, ) (Entered: 01/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) Notice of Hearing Date set for February 2, 2018 re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Memorandum in Support re #10 MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process filed by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Marc Levy)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Permit Alternative Means of Service of Process by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E. Danley and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 01/10/2018. (jlan) (Entered: 01/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey E. Danley and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5882001. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/2/2018. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/2/2018. (lcre, ) (Entered: 01/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas A. Shewmake and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5876402. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marc C. Levy and Certification of Local Counsel Craig C. Reilly Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-5876401. by Brooks Sports, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig) (Entered: 12/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 2750754, 1683840. (jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Brooks Sports, Inc. (jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Anta (China) Co., Ltd. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-5870544) filed by Brooks Sports, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(jlan) (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.