This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2018 at 08:02:39 (UTC).

BRODSKY v. DEALER SERVICES et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2018 BRODSKY filed an Other lawsuit against DEALER SERVICES. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Douglas E. Arpert and Freda L. Wolfson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-13305

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Douglas E. Arpert

Presiding Judge

Freda L. Wolfson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAY BRODSKY

Great Neck, NY 11023

Defendants

EVAN MICHEALS

DEALER SERVICES

LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION

PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES

AMERICAN MERCURY

MICHAEL SHAFTEL

WARRANTY WORLD

ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM

JOHN AND JANE DOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

PAUL K. LEARY, JR.

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

457 Haddonfield Road, Suite 300, P.O. Box 5459

Cherry Hill, NJ 08002-2220

F. BRENDEN COLLER

Attorney at COZEN O'CONNOR

1650 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Brief

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. DEALER SERVICES served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; MICHAEL SHAFTEL served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL K. LEARY, JR on behalf of DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD (LEARY, PAUL) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION to Dismiss by DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COLLER, F.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

9 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#3

(#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (mmh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER granting application to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to file the Complaint and issue summonses to be served by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/4/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of USMS. USM285 forms returned. (mmh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Addendum, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jem) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #3

Text of Proposed Order

1 #1

Complaint Addendum

#6

(#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to AMERICAN MERCURY, EVAN MICHEALS, WARRANTY WORLD. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

1 #2

Application IFP

#5

(#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN MERCURY, DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, EVAN MICHEALS, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Forwarded to USMS. (mmh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

#8

(#8) Certification of USMS that no USM 285 form was received for Defendant ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL K. LEARY, JR on behalf of DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD (LEARY, PAUL) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss. Motion set for 11/5/2018 before Judge Freda L. Wolfson. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mmh) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Dismiss by DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD. Responses due by 10/22/2018 (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(COLLER, F.) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Certification of USMS that no USM 285 form was received for Defendant ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS. DEALER SERVICES served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018; MICHAEL SHAFTEL served on 9/17/2018, answer due 10/8/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Returned Unexecuted by USMS as to AMERICAN MERCURY, EVAN MICHEALS, WARRANTY WORLD. (mmh) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS ISSUED as to AMERICAN MERCURY, DEALER SERVICES, LIBERTY AUTOMOTIVE PROTECTION, EVAN MICHEALS, PALMER ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES, ROYAL PROTECTION PROGRAM, MICHAEL SHAFTEL, WARRANTY WORLD. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Forwarded to USMS. (mmh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CERTIFICATE of USMS. USM285 forms returned. (mmh) (Entered: 09/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (mmh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT filed. See docket entry #1 for Complaint.(mmh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER granting application to proceed in forma pauperis; directing the Clerk to file the Complaint and issue summonses to be served by the U.S. Marshal. Signed by Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/4/2018. (mmh) (Entered: 09/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Addendum, #2 Application IFP, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(jem) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.