This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 15:04:16 (UTC).

Broderick-Ashburn, LLC v. Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC et al

Case Summary

On 09/18/2018 Broderick-Ashburn, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Broderick Acquisition Co , LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Michael S. Nachmanoff and Liam O'Grady. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01190

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Michael S. Nachmanoff

Presiding Judge

Liam O'Grady

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Broderick-Ashburn, LLC

Defendants, Cross Defendants and Counter Claimants

Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC

McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. doing business as Commercial Title Group, a Division of BridgeTrust Title Group

Counter Claimants and Cross Claimants

McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.

Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Robert Emmett Scully, Jr.

Attorney at Stites & Harbison PLLC

1800 Diagonal Road, Suite 325

Alexandria, VA 22314

Counter Claimant, Cross Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan Edward Levine

Attorney at Levine & Allnutt, PLLC

5311 Lee Highway

Arlington, VA 22207

Michael E. Tucci

Stinson Leonard Street Llp (Dc), 1775 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

Counter Claimant, Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorney

Michael E. Tucci

Stinson Leonard Street Llp (Dc), 1775 Pennsylvania Ave Nw, Suite 800

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#14

#15

#13

#12

11 #1

Proposed Order

#11

#10

9 #1

Exhibit 1

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

1 #4

Letter

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 2

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ANSWER to Counterclaim re #10 Crossclaim,, Counterclaim,,,,, of McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. by Broderick-Ashburn, LLC. (Scully, Robert) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Interpleader Deposit Received (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) in the amount of $2,435,195.92 (klau, ) (Entered: 11/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER granting #11 Motion for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335). Authorized deposit in the amount of $2,435,195.92. See Order for further details. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/14/2018. (rban, ) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Corporate Disclosure Statement by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. (Levine, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Interpleader Deposit (28 U.S.C. Section 1335) by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levine, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CROSSCLAIM against Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Broderick-Ashburn, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Broderick-Ashburn, LLC, CROSSCLAIM against Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC, filed by McGriff Insurance Services, Inc..(Levine, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to Counterclaim by Broderick-Ashburn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Scully, Robert) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against Broderick-Ashburn, LLC by Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC.(Tucci, Michael) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 10/15/2018. (rban, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC. (Tucci, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC. (Tucci, Michael) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AFFIDAVIT of Service Returned Eexecuted re #3 Summons Issued, in Support of Service of Process on Broderick Acquisition Co.,LLC by Broderick-Ashburn, LLC. (Scully, Robert) Modified on 10/3/2018 served on 9/27/18, answer due 10/18/18(klau, ). (Entered: 10/02/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC, McGriff Insurance Services, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Broderick-Ashburn, LLC. (klau, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Broderick Acquisition Co., LLC, McGriff Insurance Services, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6276602.), filed by Broderick-Ashburn, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Letter)(klau, ) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BB & T BANK 21657 is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Emmett Scully, Jr.