This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 18:27:06 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Tom Grainey's, Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/11/2018 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Tom Grainey's, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is Candy W. Dale. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00548

  • Filing Date:

    12/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Candy W. Dale

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Malaco Music Company

Crompton Songs

MJ Publishing Trust

Embassy Music Corporation

Rondor Music International, Inc

Interior Music Corp.

Spirit One Music

Boy Meets Girl Music

Caraljo Music, Incorporated

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Peermusic III, Ltd.

JJ Grey Music, Inc.

Conducive Music

Dynatone Publishing Company

Beechwood Music Corporation

Defendants

Tom Grainey's, Inc

Jason A Kovac

Tom Grainey

Grainey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Brad P Miller

Attorney at HAWLEY TROXELL ENNIS & HAWLEY

Po Box 1617

Boise, ID 83701

Tracy L Wright

Attorney at Hawley Troxell Ennis & Hawley, LLP

Po Box 1617

Boise, ID 83701

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) DISCOVERY PLAN by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp. . (Miller, Brad)

#9

(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Miller, Brad)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., JJ Grey Music, Inc., Spirit One Music, Conducive Music, Rondor Music International, Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, Dynatone Publishing Company, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust, Caraljo Music, Incorporated. Jason A Kovac waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., JJ Grey Music, Inc., Spirit One Music, Conducive Music, Rondor Music International, Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, Dynatone Publishing Company, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust, Caraljo Music, Incorporated. Tom Grainey's, Inc waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jason A. Kovac on December 18, 2018 by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Waiver of Service due by 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tom Grainey's, Inc. on December 18, 2018 by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Waiver of Service due by 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

#4

(#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 2/4/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons issued)(alw)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc; Other Affiliate Jadar Music Corporation for Dynatone Publishing Company; Other Affiliate Spirit Music Group, Inc. for Spirit One Music; Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Other Affiliate Brazilian Music Inc. for Peermusic III, Ltd.; Other Affiliate EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Other Affiliate Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation.. (Miller, Brad)

1 #4

Cover Sheet

1 #3

Summons as to Jason A. Kovac

1 #2

Summons as to Tom Grainey's Inc.

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1822012.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons as to Tom Grainey's Inc., #3 Summons as to Jason A. Kovac, #4 Cover Sheet)(Miller, Brad)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) DISCOVERY PLAN by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp. . (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., JJ Grey Music, Inc., Spirit One Music, Conducive Music, Rondor Music International, Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, Dynatone Publishing Company, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust, Caraljo Music, Incorporated. Jason A Kovac waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Beechwood Music Corporation, Crompton Songs, Broadcast Music, Inc., JJ Grey Music, Inc., Spirit One Music, Conducive Music, Rondor Music International, Inc, Boy Meets Girl Music, Dynatone Publishing Company, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., MJ Publishing Trust, Caraljo Music, Incorporated. Tom Grainey's, Inc waiver sent on 12/18/2018, answer due 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jason A. Kovac on December 18, 2018 by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Waiver of Service due by 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Tom Grainey's, Inc. on December 18, 2018 by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp.. Waiver of Service due by 2/19/2019. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LITIGATION ORDER AND NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE - Case Management deadline set for 2/4/2019 for the joint Litigation Plan and Discovery Plan. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 2/11/2019 11:00 AM in Boise - Courtroom 6 before Judge Candy W. Dale. Signed by Judge Candy W. Dale. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (cjs) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Print attached Summons for service.) (Attachments: #1 Summons issued)(alw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beechwood Music Corporation, Boy Meets Girl Music, Broadcast Music, Inc., Caraljo Music, Incorporated, Conducive Music, Crompton Songs, Dynatone Publishing Company, Embassy Music Corporation, Interior Music Corp., JJ Grey Music, Inc., MJ Publishing Trust, Malaco Music Company, Peermusic III, Ltd., Rondor Music International, Inc, Spirit One Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp. identifying Other Affiliate Vivendi SA for Rondor Music International, Inc; Other Affiliate Jadar Music Corporation for Dynatone Publishing Company; Other Affiliate Spirit Music Group, Inc. for Spirit One Music; Other Affiliate TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.; Other Affiliate Brazilian Music Inc. for Peermusic III, Ltd.; Other Affiliate EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Other Affiliate Capitol EMI Music Inc. for Beechwood Music Corporation.. (Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0976-1822012.), filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Summons as to Tom Grainey's Inc., #3 Summons as to Jason A. Kovac, #4 Cover Sheet)(Miller, Brad)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Dynatone Publishing Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Embassy Music Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where Beechwood Music Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where Interior Music Corp. is a litigant