This case was last updated from PACER on 07/15/2020 at 20:17:43 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 02/26/2018 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Kentucky Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Danny C. Reeves. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00157

  • Filing Date:

    02/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Kentucky Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Danny C. Reeves

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Mad Mother Music

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

BMG Rights Management US LLC

BMG Rights Management US LLC doing business as Music of Everpop

EMI Consortium Songs, Inc. doing business as EMI Longitude Music

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Defendants

Joseph Napier

Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc.

Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc. doing business as Smokin Joes Bar

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Janet P. Jakubowicz

Attorney at Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, 3500 National City Tower

Louisville, KY 40202-3197

April A. Wimberg

Attorney at Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, 3500 National City Tower

Louisville, KY 40202-3197

Aaron W. Marcus

Attorney at Bingham Greenebaum Doll LLP - Louisville

101 S. Fifth Street, 3500 National City Tower

Louisville, KY 40202-3197

 

Court Documents

7 #1

Proof of Service

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF FILING Proof of Service to Defendants re #5 Summons Issued by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service for Smokin' Joe's Sports Bar and Grill, Inc., and, Joseph Napier)(Wimberg, April) Modified on 4/20/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 04/19/2018)

#6

(#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (SCD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

5 #1

Summons Joseph Napier

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Joseph Napier, Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph Napier)(CBD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#4

(#4) Notice of Filing Form AO 121 by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. OF AO 121 - REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION RE A COPYRIGHT (Wimberg, April) Modified on 2/26/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

#3

(#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Wimberg, April) Modified on 2/26/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

1 #4

Summons Joseph Napier

1 #3

Summons Smokin' Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A - Songs Schedule

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4011972), filed by Mad Mother Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Songs Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Smokin' Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc, #4 Summons Joseph Napier)(CBD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF FILING Proof of Service to Defendants re #5 Summons Issued by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service for Smokin' Joe's Sports Bar and Grill, Inc., and, Joseph Napier)(Wimberg, April) Modified on 4/20/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 04/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding re #1 Complaint. cc: form mailed to Copyright Register. (SCD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Joseph Napier, Smokin Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc.; Summons issued and returned to counsel electronically (Attachments: #1 Summons Joseph Napier)(CBD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Notice of Filing Form AO 121 by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp. OF AO 121 - REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION RE A COPYRIGHT (Wimberg, April) Modified on 2/26/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) FRCP 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc., Mad Mother Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.. (Wimberg, April) Modified on 2/26/2018 (SCD). (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Conflict Check run. (CBD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $400; receipt number 0643-4011972), filed by Mad Mother Music, Stone Diamond Music Corp., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, BMG Rights Management US LLC, Broadcast Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., EMI Consortium Songs, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Songs Schedule, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons Smokin' Joes Sports Bar and Grill, Inc, #4 Summons Joseph Napier)(CBD) (Entered: 02/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less