This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:32:57 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Madigan's, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Madigan's, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillip J. Green and Paul L. Maloney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01326

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Western District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Phillip J. Green

Presiding Judge

Paul L. Maloney

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Wacissa River Music, Inc.

Round Hill Music LP d/b/a Round Hill Works

Sony/ATV Songs LLC d/b/a/ Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Florida Cracker Music

Tokeco Tunes

Cyanide Publishing

House of Cash, Inc.

Concord Music Group, Inc. d/b/a Jondora Music

Round Hill Music LP

Sony/ATV Songs LLC

Concord Music Group, Inc.

Concord Music Group, Inc. doing business as Jondora Music

Round Hill Music LP doing business as Round Hill Works

Sony/ATV Songs LLC doing business as Sony/ATV Tree Publishing

Defendants

Christopher Warren

William Sours

Madigan's, LLC d/b/a Madigan's

Madigan's, LLC

Madigan's, LLC doing business as Madigan's

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Patrick M. McCarthy

Attorney at Howard & Howard Attorneys PLLC (Ann Arbor)

115 West Huron St., Ste. 700

Ann Arbor, MI 48104

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Madigan's, LLC served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019 (McCarthy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

#7

(#7) REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#6

(#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Madigan's, LLC, William Sours, Christopher Warren (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (McCarthy, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#3

(#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Wacissa River Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eighth Note, Inc. for Concord Music Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE to the Register of Copyrights of the Filing of an Action by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Wacissa River Music, Inc. (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Madigan's, LLC, William Sours, Christopher Warren filed by Wacissa River Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Tokeco Tunes (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS returned executed; Madigan's, LLC served on 12/14/2018, answer due 1/4/2019 (McCarthy, Patrick) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Copy of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright #7 , complaint, #1 sent via U.S. Mail to Copyright Office (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPORT from the Clerk, WDMI, to the Register of Copyrights on the filing of a COPYRIGHT ACTION (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Madigan's, LLC, William Sours, Christopher Warren (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE that this case has been assigned Paul L. Maloney (ems) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re #1 (McCarthy, Patrick) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Wacissa River Music, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Eighth Note, Inc. for Concord Music Group, Inc.; Corporate Parent Sony Music Entertainment, Inc. for Sony/ATV Songs LLC; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc. (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE to the Register of Copyrights of the Filing of an Action by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Wacissa River Music, Inc. (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEE PAID re #1 by plaintiffs Broadcast Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Wacissa River Music, Inc. in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4302700 (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/30/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Madigan's, LLC, William Sours, Christopher Warren filed by Wacissa River Music, Inc., Concord Music Group, Inc., Sony/ATV Songs LLC, Florida Cracker Music, House of Cash, Inc., Round Hill Music LP, Broadcast Music, Inc., Cyanide Publishing, Tokeco Tunes (McCarthy, Patrick) Modified text on 11/29/2018 (ems). (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Madigan is a litigant

Latest cases where Concord Music Group Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Round Hill Music, LP is a litigant

Latest cases where Sony/ATV Songs LLC is a litigant