This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/16/2020 at 17:11:23 (UTC).

Broadcast Music, Inc. et al v. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/08/2018 Broadcast Music, Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Steve C. Jones. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-05159

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steve C. Jones

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Broadcast Music, Inc.

Gold Hill Music, Inc.

Fuel Publishing, Inc.

Welsh Witch Music

Crooked Chimney Music, Inc.

Stone Diamond Music Corp.

Songs of Universal, Inc.

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.

Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.

Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation

Fuel Publishing, Inc. doing business as Pener Pig Publishing

Defendants

Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC

Richard Stoll

Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC doing business as Huey Luey's Acworth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Troy R. Covington

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

Ryan T. Pumpian

Attorney at Bloom Parham, LLP

977 Ponce De Leon Avenue, Ne

Atlanta, GA 30306-4265

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Richard Stoll served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#5

(#5) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#4

(#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#3

(#3) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

2 #1

Summons Richard Stoll

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC and Richard Stoll. (Attachments: #1 Summons Richard Stoll)(rlb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit 1

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8263039) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/13/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Richard Stoll served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Broadcast Music, Inc.. Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC served on 12/3/2018, answer due 12/24/2018. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Clerk's Certificate of Mailing to Register of Copyrights re #5 A.O. Form 121 Copyright. (rjs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AO Form 121 forwarded to Registrar. (rjs) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Broadcast Music, Inc., Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Gold Hill Music, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Welsh Witch Music identifying Corporate Parent Warner Music Group Corp. for Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp.; Corporate Parent Vivendi S.A. for Songs of Universal, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc.; Corporate Parent EMI Group Global Ltd. for Stone Diamond Music Corp.; Corporate Parent TEGNA, Inc. for Broadcast Music, Inc.. (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PROPOSED AO 121 . (Covington, Troy) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • Notice of deficiency re AO Form 120. Plaintiff must complete and file AO Form 120. See LR 3.4 and LPR 1.4. Docket the form using the event AO 120, located in the Other Filings/Other Documents menu. (rlb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Huey Luey's Acworth, LLC and Richard Stoll. (Attachments: #1 Summons Richard Stoll)(rlb) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Crooked Chimney Music, Inc., Fuel Publishing, Inc., Welsh Witch Music, Songs of Universal, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Stone Diamond Music Corp., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Blues Traveler Publishing Corporation, Gold Hill Music, Inc., Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8263039) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(rlb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Gold Hill Music, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fuel Publishing Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Stone Diamond Music Corp is a litigant