This case was last updated from PACER on 06/05/2018 at 07:02:28 (UTC).

Broadcast Music Inc et al v. 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2018 Broadcast Music Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Copyright lawsuit against 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Colin Stirling Bruce and Eric I. Long. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-02100

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Copyright

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Colin Stirling Bruce

Referral Judge

Eric I. Long

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Benny Bird Company Inc

Songs of Universal Inc

ARC Music Corp

Buzzard Rock Music

Showbilly Music

EMI Blackwood Music Inc

Against The Wind Publishing

Still Working For The Man Music Inc

Combustion III LLC

Tokeco Tunes

Songs Of The Corn

Kickin Grids Music

Songs From The Engine Room

Warner/Chappell Music Inc

Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp

Turn Me On Music

Broadcast Music Inc

Defendants

'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon LLC

Lia Marie Trosper

Morris Dean Trosper, II

1 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

Suite 3200, 444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

Charles A Laff

Attorney at MICHAEL BEST & FRIEDRICH LLP

Suite 3200, 444 West Lake Street

Chicago, IL 60606

 

Court Documents

#9

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#3

(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Against The Wind Publishing, Arc Music Corp., Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Combustion III LLC d/b/a Internal Combustion Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Kickin Grids Music, Showbilly Music, Songs From The Engine Room, Songs Of The Corn, Songs of Universal, Inc., Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Turn Me On Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music Inc. d/b/a Southside Independent Music Publishing. (Laff, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Charles A Laff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Laff, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

1 #4

Summons for Lia Marie Trosper

1 #3

Summons for Morris Dean Trosper, II

1 #2

Summons for 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2810130.), filed by Buzzard Rock Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs Of The Corn, Broadcast Music, Inc., Against The Wind Publishing, Songs From The Engine Room, Combustion III LLC d/b/a Internal Combustion Music, Tokeco Tunes, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Turn Me On Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music Inc. d/b/a Southside Independent Music Publishing, Kickin Grids Music, Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Arc Music Corp., Showbilly Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon, #3 Summons for Morris Dean Trosper, II, #4 Summons for Lia Marie Trosper)(Laff, Charles) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2018) (KE, ilcd). (Entered: 04/06/2018)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buzzard Rock Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Songs Of The Corn, Broadcast Music Inc, Against The Wind Publishing, Songs From The Engine Room, Combustion III LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Benny Bird Company Inc, Turn Me On Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc, Kickin Grids Music, Still Working For The Man Music Inc, ARC Music Corp, Showbilly Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. Lia Marie Trosper served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buzzard Rock Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Songs Of The Corn, Broadcast Music Inc, Against The Wind Publishing, Songs From The Engine Room, Combustion III LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Benny Bird Company Inc, Turn Me On Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc, Kickin Grids Music, Still Working For The Man Music Inc, ARC Music Corp, Showbilly Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. Morris Dean Trosper, II served on 4/20/2018, answer due 5/11/2018. (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Buzzard Rock Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International Inc, Songs of Universal Inc, Songs Of The Corn, Broadcast Music Inc, Against The Wind Publishing, Songs From The Engine Room, Combustion III LLC, Tokeco Tunes, Benny Bird Company Inc, Turn Me On Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp, Warner/Chappell Music Inc, Kickin Grids Music, Still Working For The Man Music Inc, ARC Music Corp, Showbilly Music, EMI Blackwood Music Inc. 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon LLC served on 4/23/2018, answer due 5/14/2018. (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 04/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Gilberto Eduardo Espinoza on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Espinoza, Gilberto) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon LLC, Lia Marie Trosper, Morris Dean Trosper, II. (Mailed to Attorney Charles Laff for service.) (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding Copyright. (KE, ilcd) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTEREST pursuant to Local Rule 11.3 by Against The Wind Publishing, Arc Music Corp., Benny Bird Company, Inc., Broadcast Music, Inc., Buzzard Rock Music, Combustion III LLC d/b/a Internal Combustion Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc., Kickin Grids Music, Showbilly Music, Songs From The Engine Room, Songs Of The Corn, Songs of Universal, Inc., Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Tokeco Tunes, Turn Me On Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music Inc. d/b/a Southside Independent Music Publishing. (Laff, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Charles A Laff on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Laff, Charles) (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0753-2810130.), filed by Buzzard Rock Music, Universal-Songs of Polygram International, Inc., Songs of Universal, Inc., Songs Of The Corn, Broadcast Music, Inc., Against The Wind Publishing, Songs From The Engine Room, Combustion III LLC d/b/a Internal Combustion Music, Tokeco Tunes, Benny Bird Company, Inc., Turn Me On Music, Warner-Tamerlane Publishing Corp., Warner/Chappell Music Inc. d/b/a Southside Independent Music Publishing, Kickin Grids Music, Still Working For The Man Music, Inc., Arc Music Corp., Showbilly Music, EMI Blackwood Music, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for 'Cafe' Cabana and Shovelhead Saloon, #3 Summons for Morris Dean Trosper, II, #4 Summons for Lia Marie Trosper)(Laff, Charles) (Main Document 1 replaced on 4/6/2018) (KE, ilcd). (Entered: 04/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less