This case was last updated from PACER on 07/16/2020 at 19:14:30 (UTC).

Brittney v. Hy-Bon Engineering Company, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/24/2018 Brittney filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Hy-Bon Engineering Company, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is S. Kato Crews. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-03311

  • Filing Date:

    12/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Derosier Brittney

Brittney Derosier

Defendants

Brian Dasinger

Wesley Allen

Inayat Virani

Regal Beloit America, Inc.

Hy-Bon Engineering Company, Inc.

Inayat (I) Virani

Wesley (I) Allen

EDI Holding Company, LLC

EDI Holding Company, LLC doing business as EDI Engineering Company, Inc.

Regal Beloit America, Inc. doing business as Hy-Bon/EDI Engineering Company, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Dale Henry Pugh

Attorney at Dale Pugh Law

11374 Xavier Drive, Suite 202

Westminster, CO 80031

Defendant Attorneys

Steven R. Reid

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.-Denver

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80222

David L. Zwisler

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart, P.C.-Denver

2000 South Colorado Boulevard, Tower Three, Suite 900

Denver, CO 80222

 

Court Documents

#21

(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines and settings in this case shall be terminated by the Clerk of Court, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/5/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brittney Derosier. (Pugh, Dale) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendants EDI Holding Company, LLC, Hy-Bon Engineering Company, Inc. (Zwisler, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

13 #2

Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue

#13

(#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Brian Dasinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Wesley Allen, Wesley (I) Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

11 #3

Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue

11 #2

Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue

11 #1

Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination

1 #12

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #9

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service - Wesley Allen

1 #8

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service - Regal Beloit America, Inc.

1 #7

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Civil Procedure Order

1 #6

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Wesley Allen

1 #5

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Regal Beloit America, Inc.

1 #4

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Inayat Virani

1 #3

Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Brian Dasinger

1 #2

Exhibit A - State Court Action - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet

38 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER granting #20 Motion to Dismiss with Prejudice. IT IS ORDERED that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that all remaining deadlines and settings in this case shall be terminated by the Clerk of Court, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/5/2019. Text Only Entry (jgonz, ) (Entered: 02/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Dismiss by Plaintiff Brittney Derosier. (Pugh, Dale) (Entered: 02/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MINUTE ORDER re: #18 Notice of Settlement. In light of the parties' Notice of Settlement, the Settlement Conference set for 3/14/2019 and the corresponding filing deadlines are VACATED. FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file their Dismissal Papers by 3/6/2019. In the event the parties are unable to reach a final agreement, they shall file a Status Report on 3/6/2019 requesting additional time to file their dismissal papers, or that the Scheduling Conference be reset. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 2/4/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, ) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE of Settlement by Defendants EDI Holding Company, LLC, Hy-Bon Engineering Company, Inc. (Zwisler, David) (Entered: 02/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER finding as moot Defendants' Motions to Dismiss #10 , #11 , #12 ,& #13 . Plaintiff filed her Amended Complaint (ECF. #16 ) as a matter of course pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(b). Accordingly, Defendants Regal Beloit America, Inc., Inayat Virani, Wesley Allen, and Brian Dasinger's Motions to Dismiss (ECF. # #10 , #11 , #12 , & #13 ) are moot. Defendants' responses to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint are due 2/4/2019. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(3). SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/22/2019. Text Only Entry (skclc2, ) (Entered: 01/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Brittney Derosier. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Pugh, Dale) (Entered: 01/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dale Henry Pugh on behalf of Brittney DerosierAttorney Dale Henry Pugh added to party Brittney Derosier(pty:pla) (Pugh, Dale) (Entered: 01/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) ERRATA re #1 Notice of Removal,,,, by Defendants Wesley Allen, Wesley (I) Allen, Regal Beloit America, Inc., Inayat Virani, Inayat (I) Virani. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Amended Declaration of Terry Colvin)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendant Brian Dasinger. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendants Wesley Allen, Wesley (I) Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) by Defendant Regal Beloit America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit 2 - Request for Notices of Right to Sue, #3 Exhibit 3 - CCRD's Notice of Right to Sue)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MINUTE ORDER MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 3/14/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 3/7/2019. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #8 ) is due 3/7/2019. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 12/27/2018. Text Only Entry (skclc2, ) (Entered: 12/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • (#7) FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Civil Procedure Order upon Wesley Allen on 12/10/2018 (dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Complaint upon The Corporation Service Company for Regal Beloit America, Inc. on 12/03/2018 (dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) COMPLAINT against Wesley Allen, Wesley (I) Allen, Brian Dasinger, Regal Beloit America, Inc., Inayat Virani, Inayat (I) Virani, filed by Brittney Derosier.(dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 12/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Steven R. Reid on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Wesley Allen(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Brian Dasinger(pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Regal Beloit America, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Steven R. Reid added to party Inayat Virani(pty:dft) (Reid, Steven) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Inayat Virani, Regal Beloit America, Inc., Wesley Allen from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2018CV31885. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6455049), filed by Inayat Virani, Regal Beloit America, Inc., Wesley Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Action - State Court Complaint (with Exhibit 1), #2 Exhibit A - State Court Action - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Brian Dasinger, #4 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Inayat Virani, #5 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Regal Beloit America, Inc., #6 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Summons to Wesley Allen, #7 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Civil Procedure Order, #8 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service - Regal Beloit America, Inc., #9 Exhibit A - State Court Action - Return of Service - Wesley Allen, #10 Exhibit B - Declaration of Terry Colvin, #11 Exhibit C - Charge of Discrimination, #12 Civil Cover Sheet)(Zwisler, David) (Entered: 12/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Regal Beloit America, Inc. is a litigant