This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/26/2020 at 08:55:06 (UTC).

Bristol Preservation, LLC v. Knight 39 Holdings, LLC et al (TV1)

Case Summary

On 12/02/2016 Bristol Preservation, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Knight 39 Holdings, LLC TV1. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas A Varlan, Clifton L Corker and MJ Clifton L Corker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:16-CV-00360

  • Filing Date:

    12/02/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas A Varlan

Referral Judges

Clifton L Corker

MJ Clifton L Corker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Bristol Preservation, LLC

Defendants and Counter Claimants

Knight 39 Holdings, LLC

Knight 39 Holdings, LLC(TV1)

IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC

Integrity Golf Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Andrew M Hanson

Attorney at Penn Stuart

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620-2266

Holly N Mancl

Attorney at Fisher & Phillips LLP (Charlotte)

227 West Trade Street, Suite 2020

Charlotte, NC 28202

Richard E Ladd, Jr

Attorney at Penn Stuart

804 Anderson Street

Bristol, TN 37620-2266

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Michelle Manzoian

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (Cleveland OH)

Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Michael S Lattier

Attorney at Hunter, Smith & Davis - Kingsport

1212 N. Eastman Road, P O Box 3740

Kingsport, TN 37664

Joseph F Verciglio

Attorney at Baker Hostetler (Cleveland)

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Michael A VanNiel

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP (Cleveland OH)

Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114-1214

Thomas L Kilday

Attorney at Milligan & Coleman

P O Box 1060, 230 West Depot Street

Greeneville, TN 37744-1060

 

Court Documents

#34

#33

#32

#31

#30

#29

#28

#15

#13

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Other

1 #2

Exhibit B- Notice of Removal (state court)

1 #1

Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons

#1

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) STIPULATION of Dismissal case with Prejudice by Bristol Preservation, LLC. (Hanson, Andrew) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) ANSWER to Complaint by Knight 39 Holdings, LLC.(VanNiel, Michael) (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) Notice of Attorney Withdrawal Attorney Holly N Mancl terminated. (Hanson, Andrew) (Entered: 06/28/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER, the Court hereby DENIES plaintiff's Motion to Remand #13 . The Court also GRANTS in part and DENIES in part Knight 39's Motion to Dismiss #9 , in that all claims against Knight 39 except for procurement of breach of contract and injunctive relief are hereby DISMISSED. The Court also GRANTS plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Counterclaims #15 , in that all counterclaims asserted by IGC-Bristol against plaintiff are DISMISSED. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 6/26/17. (ADA) (Entered: 06/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hanson, Andrew) (Entered: 02/27/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF NONCONSENT By IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC, Integrity Golf Company, LLC, Knight 39 Holdings, LLC, and Bristol Preservation, LLC by IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC, Integrity Golf Company, LLC, Knight 39 Holdings, LLC (Manzoian, Michelle) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Order Governing Depositions. Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/1/17. (ABF) (Entered: 02/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) SCHEDULING ORDER: Bench Trial set for 4/23/2018 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2018 03:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Knoxville before Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan.Signed by Chief District Judge Thomas A Varlan on 2/1/17. (ABF) (Entered: 02/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) REPLY to Response to Motion re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by Bristol Preservation, LLC. (Hanson, Andrew) (Entered: 01/24/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION AND IMPROPER VENUE filed by IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC. (VanNiel, Michael) (Entered: 01/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3272608.) by IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC, Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3272602.) by IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC, Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 90 receipt number 0649-3272591.) by IGC-Bristol Country Club, LLC, Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/06/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to attorney Michelle Manzoian: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (c/m) (ABF) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Attorney Michael VanNiel: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (c/m) (ABF) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Deficiency (Pro Hac) to Attorney Joseph Verciglio: Attorney is not admitted (See LR 83.5). This matter will be referred to a magistratejudge if a pro hac motion is not filed within 15 days of this Notice. A form motioncan be found here: http://www.tned.uscourts.gov/docs/pro_hac_vice.pdf. (c/m) (ABF) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • DocketChief District Judge Thomas A Varlan and Magistrate Judge Clifton L Corker added. (ABF) (Entered: 12/05/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Corporate Interest by Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Sullivan County Law Court at Bristol, Tennessee, case number C15349(M). (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0649-3270772), filed by Knight 39 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, Summons, #2 Exhibit B- Notice of Removal (state court), #3 Other)(Lattier, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Integrity Golf Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael A. VanNiel