This case was last updated from PACER on 12/28/2018 at 07:19:55 (UTC).

BRISKIN v. SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 10/29/2018 BRISKIN filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph A. Dickson and Jose L. Linares. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-15404

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Joseph A. Dickson

Presiding Judge

Jose L. Linares

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Stephen Briskin

Defendants

SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA

SONY ELECTRONICS INC.

SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DOMENIC B. SANGINITI

Attorney at COOPER LEVENSON

1125 Atlantic Avenue, Third Floor

Atlantic City, NJ 08401

Defendant Attorney

ROBERT J. HAFNER

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla

1700 Market Street, Suite 1418

Philadelphia, PA 19103-3907

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/27/18. (nm, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#5

(#5) ANSWER to Complaint by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/03/2018)

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ELECTRONICS INC. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

1 #10

Declaration Sony Electronics Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form

1 #9

Declaration Sony Corporation of Americal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form

1 #8

Declaration Sony Energy Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Completed Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit C - Sony Electronics Inc.'s Consent to Removal

1 #5

Exhibit B - Sony Corporation of America Consent to Removal

1 #4

Exhibit A3 - Sony Electronics Inc. Answer to Original Complaint filed in state c

1 #3

Exhibit A2 - Sony Corporation of America Answer to Original Complaint filed in s

1 #2

Exhibit A1 - Plaintiff's Orignial Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit A- Amended Complaint served on Sony Energy Devices Corporation

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey (Bergen County), case number BER-L-1461-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9131383), filed by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint served on Sony Energy Devices Corporation, #2 Exhibit A1 - Plaintiff's Orignial Complaint, #3 Exhibit A2 - Sony Corporation of America Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #4 Exhibit A3 - Sony Electronics Inc. Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #5 Exhibit B - Sony Corporation of America Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit C - Sony Electronics Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Completed Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Declaration Sony Energy Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #9 Declaration Sony Corporation of Americal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #10 Declaration Sony Electronics Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form)(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER: Initial Conference set for 1/22/2019 11:30 AM in Newark - Courtroom 2D before Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson on 11/27/18. (nm, ) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Complaint and the notice of removal document Number 1 submitted by Robert Hafner on October 29, 2018 appears to have address information for Domenic B. Sanginiti that does not match the court's records for this case. Please refer to the court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for information and instructions on maintaining your account. (ys, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to Complaint by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION.(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 11/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • Chief Judge Jose L. Linares and Magistrate Judge Joseph A. Dickson added. (eu, ) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ELECTRONICS INC. identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION identifying Sony Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION from Superior Court of New Jersey (Bergen County), case number BER-L-1461-18. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9131383), filed by SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Amended Complaint served on Sony Energy Devices Corporation, #2 Exhibit A1 - Plaintiff's Orignial Complaint, #3 Exhibit A2 - Sony Corporation of America Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #4 Exhibit A3 - Sony Electronics Inc. Answer to Original Complaint filed in state court action, #5 Exhibit B - Sony Corporation of America Consent to Removal, #6 Exhibit C - Sony Electronics Inc.'s Consent to Removal, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Completed Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Declaration Sony Energy Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #9 Declaration Sony Corporation of Americal Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form, #10 Declaration Sony Electronics Inc. Rule 7.1 Disclosure Form)(HAFNER, ROBERT) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SONY ENERGY DEVICES CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY CORPORATION OF AMERICA is a litigant

Latest cases where SONY ELECTRONICS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT J. HAFNER