This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/11/2021 at 07:03:00 (UTC).

Brewer v. Air & Liquid Systems Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 10/17/2018 Brewer filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Air Liquid Systems Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are H Russel Holland, G Murray Snow and Roslyn O Silver. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03339

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

H Russel Holland

G Murray Snow

Roslyn O Silver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Lidia Brewer

Defendants

Viad Corporation

Devon Energy Corporation

Pfizer Incorporated

Ingersoll-Rand Company

O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC

Morgan Engineering Incorporated

William Powell Company

Air & Liquid Systems Corporation

O'Reilly Automotive Stores Incorporated

Warren Pumps LLC

Elliott Company

Goulds Pumps Incorporated

General Electric Company

Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California

J.T. Thorpe & Son Incorporated

Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP

CNH Industrial America LLC

Cyprus Amax Minerals Company

Weir Valves & Controls USA Incorporated

41 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jordan Blumenfeld-James

Attorney at Simon Greenstone Panatier PC

3780 Kilroy Airport Wy., Ste. 540

Long Beach, CA 90806

Andrew Compton

Attorney at Compton Law PC

1423 S Higley Rd., Ste. 112

Mesa, AZ 85206

Andrew B Compton

Attorney at Compton Law PC

1423 S Higley Rd., Ste. 112

Mesa, AZ 85206

Defendant Attorneys

J Steven Sparks

Attorney at Sanders & Parks PC

3030 N 3Rd St., Ste. 1300

Phoenix, AZ 85012-3099

Larry Jay Crown

Attorney at Titus Brueckner & Levine PC

8355 E Hartford Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

Elan Shai Mizrahi

Attorney at Titus Brueckner & Levine PC

8355 E Hartford Dr., Ste. 200

Scottsdale, AZ 85255

John Charles Hendricks

Attorney at Meagher & Geer PLLP - Scottsdale, AZ

16767 N Perimeter Dr., Ste. 210

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Kathleen L Beiermeister

Attorney at Meagher & Geer PLLP - Scottsdale, AZ

16767 N Perimeter Dr., Ste. 210

Scottsdale, AZ 85260

Tyler Brandon Sankey

Attorney at Cavanagh Law Firm PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Daniel Geary Roberts

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Jeremy Arian Lite

Attorney at Quarles & Brady LLP - Phoenix, AZ

One Renaissance Square, 2 N Central Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85004-2391

Robert S Murphy

Attorney at Law Office of Robert S Murphy LLC

1650 N 1St Ave.

Phoenix, AZ 85003-1124

Thomas A Maraz

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Hannah Hatch Porter

Attorney at Gallagher & Kennedy PA

2575 E Camelback Rd., Ste. 1100

Phoenix, AZ 85016-9225

Other Attorneys

Ronald Lyle Hellbusch

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Denver, CO

1700 Lincoln St., Ste. 4000

Denver, CO 80203

Carol Marie Romano

Attorney at Resnick & Louis PC

8111 E Indian Bend Rd.

Scottsdale, AZ 85250

Stephen M Bressler

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Lindsey Christine Herzog

Attorney at Lewis Roca Rothgerber Christie LLP - Phoenix Office

201 E Washington St., Ste. 1200

Phoenix, AZ 85004

Shawn Michael Petri

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP - Phoenix, AZ

2929 N Central Ave., Ste. 1700

Phoenix, AZ 85012

Cassandra Victoria Meyer

Attorney at Cavanagh Law Firm PA

1850 N Central Ave., Ste. 2400

Phoenix, AZ 85004

20 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#343

#342

341 #1

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

#341

#340

339 #2

Exhibit 2

#339

#338

#335

1 #3

Exhibit C

#5

#3

2 #5

Exhibit

2 #4

Exhibit

2 #3

Exhibit

2 #2

Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

435 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#344) MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to #343 Order regarding filing a request to reinstate and no request having been filed, the civil case is dismissed with prejudice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#343) ORDER the stipulation to dismiss Warren Pumps, LLC without prejudice (Doc. #341 ) is GRANTED. This matter is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as to Defendant Warren Pumps, LLC only, each party to bear their own costs and fees. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED Warren Pumps' motion for summary judgement (Doc. #335 ) is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the remainder of this case will be dismissed with prejudice by the Clerk's Office on April 2, 2021, unless prior thereto a request for reinstatement on the Court's trial calendar is filed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED all other deadlines and hearing dates are VACATED. Signed by Senior Judge Roslyn O Silver on 3/18/2021. (CLB) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#342) NOTICE re: of Resolution by Lidia Brewer . (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) (Entered: 03/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#341) STIPULATION of Dismissal of Defendant, Warren Pumps, LLC by Lidia Brewer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Blumenfeld-James, Jordan) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#340) *NOTICE of Settlement and Withdrawal of Pending Motions by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J) *Modified to terminate pending motions withdrawn on 3/12/2021 (MFR). (Entered: 03/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#339) STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #338 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Sparks, J) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#338) MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Sparks, J) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#337) MOTION Daubert Motion to Exclude Plaintiff's Expert's Causation Opinion and Request for Evidentiary Hearing by Honeywell International Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18)(Sparks, J) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#336) STATEMENT OF FACTS re: #335 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E - Part 1, #6 Exhibit E - Part 2)(Hendricks, John) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#335) MOTION for Summary Judgment and Supporting Memorandum of Law by Warren Pumps LLC. (Hendricks, John) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
329 More Docket Entries
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE TO PARTY RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Corporate Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Corporate Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Corporate Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to AutoZone West LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, General Electric Company, Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Velan Valve Corporation. (MFR) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: #4 Joinder. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (DXD) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MFR) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joinder re: #2 Notice of Removal filed by CBS Corporation by Defendant Crane Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 part 1, #4 Exhibit 3 part 2, #5 Exhibit 3 part 3, #6 Exhibit 3 part 4, #7 Exhibit 4)(Beiermeister, Kathleen) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Joinder re: #2 Notice of Removal in CBS Corporation's Notice of Removal by Defendant Viad Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Sparks, J) *Modified linkage on 10/19/2018 (DXD). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-16088456. This case has been assigned to the Honorable H Russel Holland. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-18-3339-PHX-HRH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (MFR) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/17/18*** ANSWER to Original Complaint by AutoZone West LLC (Filed in State Court on 9/26/18), Velan Valve Corporation (Filed in State Court on 9/27/18), Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport-McMoran Sierrita Incorporated, General Electric Company, Phelps Dodge Industries Incorporated (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18), Pep Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18), Union Carbide Corporation (Filed in State Court on 10/15/18). ***Docketed in US District Court on 10/17/18 for case management purposes.***(MFR) *Modified linkage/text/add answering party on 10/26/2018 (DXD). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • Docket***State Court record received on 10/17/18*** SERVICE EXECUTED: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint, and Certificate of Compulsory Arbitration upon Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, AutoZone West LLC, Cameron International Corporation, Caterpillar Incorporated, Caterpillar Global Mining LLC, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Flowserve US Incorporated and FMC Corporation on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); General Electric Company on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18); Ingersoll-Rand Company, ITT Corporation, J.T. Thorpe & Son and Joy Global Surface Mining Incorporated on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/11/18); O'Reilly Auto Enterprises LLC, O'Reilly Automotive Stores LLC, Pennzoil-Quaker State Company, Pep-Boys Manny Moe & Jack of California, Pfizer Incorporated, Union Carbide Corporation, Viad Corporation and Terex Corporation on 9/17/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18); Crane Company, CBS Corporation, Elliott Company, and Freeport-McMoRan Sierrita Incorporated on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); Gardner Denver Incorporated on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/9/18); IMO Industries Incorporated, Link-Belt Cranes LP LLP, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Goulds Pumps Incorporated and Honeywell International on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/11/2018); Warran Pumps LLC, Velvan Valve Corporation and Phelps Dodge Industries on 9/18/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/2018); Air & Liquid Systems Corporation on 9/20/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/8/18); William Powell Company on 9/20/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18); Morgan Engineering Incorporated on 9/21/18 (Filed in State Court on 10/12/18). ***Docketed in US District Court on 10/17/18 for case management purposes.*** (MFR) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. *Modified to correct docket text on 10/19/2018 (MFR). *Modified text on 10/22/2018 (DXD). (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen) (MFR) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Maricopa County Superior Court, case number CV2018-096382. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16088456 filed by CBS Corporation. (Bressler, Stephen) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(MFR) (Entered: 10/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Link-Belt Cranes LP LLLP is a litigant

Latest cases where Morgan Engineering Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where DEVON ENERGY CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where THE PEP BOYS- MANNY & JACK OF CALIFORNIA INC is a litigant