This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/04/2020 at 06:52:57 (UTC).

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc. et al v. MLTD, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 05/31/2017 Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against MLTD, Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John E. McDermott, Beverly Reid O'Connell and Terry J. Hatter, Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:17-CV-04058

  • Filing Date:

    05/31/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John E. McDermott

Presiding Judges

Beverly Reid O'Connell

Terry J. Hatter, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.

Zion Rootswear LLC

Defendants and Cross Defendants

Odd Sox, LLC

Ahmad Akar

Third Estate, LLC

Long Tran

Ravenlite, LLC

Chris Ngo

Edward Grayver

Fourth DTSA

Black Market USA

Money Matters NYC, Inc.

Ruslan Karablin

Lawrence Ksido

Matthew Fields

MLTD, Inc.

Fourth DTSA doing business as Fourthonline.com

Russ Karablin

Ravenlite, LLC doing business as SSUR

Third Estate, LLC doing business as Dope Clothing

Defendant and Cross Claimant

MLTD, Inc.

11 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kenneth A Feinswog

Attorney at Kenneth A Feinswog Law Offices

400 Corporate Pointe Suite 300

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendant and Cross Defendant Attorneys

Brittany J Maxey-Fisher

Attorney at Maxey-Fisher PLLC

100 Second Avenue South Suite 401 North

St Petersburg, FL 33701

Samuel E Cooley

Attorney at Cooley Legal

8981 Sunset Boulevard Suite 104

West Hollywood, CA 90069

Jayson Singh Sohi

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Daniel C Cotman

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Obi Ian Iloputaife

Attorney at Cotman IP Law Group PLC

35 Hugus Alley Suite 210

Pasadena, CA 91103

Jacqueline M Lesser

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

2929 Arch Street Cira Centre 12Th Floor

Philadelphia, PA 19104-2891

Robert C Welsh

Attorney at Baker and Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

Robert Walter Thompson

Attorney at Callahan Thompson Sherman and Caudill LLP

2601 Main Street Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Brett E Bitzer

Attorney at Callahan Thompson Sherman and Caudill LLP

2601 Main Street Suite 800

Irvine, CA 92614

Glen L Kulik

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman Siegel and Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Patricia Brum

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman and Siegel LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Defendant and Cross Claimant Attorneys

Glen L Kulik

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman Siegel and Ware LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Patricia Brum

Attorney at Kulik Gottesman and Siegel LLP

15303 Ventura Boulevard Suite 1400

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

 

Court Documents

#116

115 #1

Proposed Order

#115

#114

#113

#112

111 #1

Proposed Order

#111

#110

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

#1

161 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#116) ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr, GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Action #115 . The stipulation filed by the parties under Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is approved. It is ORDERED that the cross-claim filed by defendant and cross-claimant MLTD, Inc. (MLTD) against Third Estate, LLC, dba Dope Clothing and Matthew Fields is hereby dismissed with prejudice with both sides to bear their own legal fees and costs., (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (shb) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#115) Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Cross-Claimant MLTD, Inc., Joint STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Defendant MLTD, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Kulik, Glen) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#114) NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Defendant MLTD, Inc. pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) (A)(i) as to Acapulco Gold, LLC, Ahmad Akar, Agustin Galan, Dalia Kaissi, Ruslan Karablin, Lawrence Ksido, Odd Sox, LLC, Ravenlite, LLC, Vintage Bleach, LLC, Christopher Washington. (Kulik, Glen) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#113) ORDER TO DISMISS CERTAIN PARTIES #111 by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr.: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' claims against MLTD are hereby dismissed with prejudice with all parties bearing their own attorneys' fees and costs. (bm) (Entered: 04/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#112) MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES OF COURT ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: On the Courts own motion, the Final Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for April 15, 2019, is hereby ordered continued to APRIL 22, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. Counsel for the parties are ordered to appear. Counsel are reminded that all pretrial documents are due no later than 21 days before the final pretrial conference hearing date. See order for further details. (shb) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#111) STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant MLTD, Inc. filed by Plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#110) ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: DENYING #101 APPLICATION for Clerk to Enter Default against Cross-Defendants Ahmad Akar, Odd Sox, LLC. It is Ordered that the request for entry of default against former Cross Defendants Odd Sox, LLC and Ahmad Akar be, and hereby is, Denied. (shb) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#109) Notice of Electronic Filing re Stipulation to Continue #107 , Order, Set/Reset Hearing #108 e-mailed to Robert C Welsh at rwelsh@bakerlaw.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 User Unknown. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 01/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#108) ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr,GRANTING Stipulation to Continue Final Pre-Trial Conference, #107 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Final Pretrial Conference is hereby continued from February 25, 2019 until April 15, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. (shb) (Entered: 01/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#107) STIPULATION to Continue Pretrial Conference from February 25, 2019 to April 8, 2019 Re: Order, Set/Reset Hearing #104 filed by Plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 01/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
96 More Docket Entries
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to defendants Ahmad Akar, Black Market USA, Matthew Fields, Fourth DTSA, Edward Grayver, Ruslan Karablin, Lawrence Ksido, MLTD, Inc., Money Matters NYC, Inc., Chris Ngo, Odd Sox, LLC, Ravenlite, LLC, Third Estate, LLC, Long Tran. (jp) (Entered: 06/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., Zion Rootswear LLC. (Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendant's name must appear in the "To:" section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jp) (Entered: 06/19/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., Zion Rootswear LLC. (Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 06/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES upon filing of the complaint by Judge Beverly Reid O'Connell. (rfi) (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Beverly Reid OConnell and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (esa) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, identifying Vivendi SA. (Attorney Kenneth A Feinswog added to party Zion Rootswear LLC(pty:pla))(Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc., Zion Rootswear LLC. (Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19940796 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiffs Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.. (Attorney Kenneth A Feinswog added to party Bravado International Group Merchandising Services Inc.(pty:pla))(Feinswog, Kenneth) (Entered: 05/31/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Zion Rootswear LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Bravado International Group Merchandising Services, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patricia Brum