This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2019 at 07:38:45 (UTC).

Braun v. Total Fleet Service, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/28/2018 Braun filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Total Fleet Service, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan L Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00431

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Indiana Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan L Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael D. Braun

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant

Total Fleet Service, LLC

215 E. Berry Street

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Not Classified By Court

C Erik Chickedantz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Lori W Jansen

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Christopher C Myers

Attorney at Christopher C Myers & Associates

809 S Calhoun St Ste 400

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Defendant Attorneys

Anthony M Stites

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

Rachel K Steinhofer

Attorney at Barrett McNagny LLP

215 E Berry St, Po Box 2263

Fort Wayne, IN 46802

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Michael D. Braun (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Vacate #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Michael D. Braun. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#11

(#11) **VACATED Pursuant to DE 13 ** REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) Modified on 2/11/2019 (mr). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

#10

(#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins and Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (lhc) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#9

(#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steinhofer, Rachel) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

#8

(#8) DISCLOSURE of Corporate filed by Total Fleet Service, LLC.(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Total Fleet Service, LLC.(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

#6

(#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of Total Fleet Service, LLC (Steinhofer, Rachel) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

#2

(#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of Total Fleet Service, LLC (Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3769519.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1811-CT-000670, filed by Total Fleet Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/22/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Lori Jansen. Dft appeared by atty Rachel Steinhofer. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved. Discovery deadline is 11/15/2019. Dispositive motions to be filed by 12/16/2019. Erik Chickedantz appointed as mediator. Atty Steinhofer to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Jansen. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Lori W Jansen on behalf of Michael D. Braun (Jansen, Lori) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2019
  • (#15) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference RESET for 2/22/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr) (Entered: 02/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • (#14) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: On the Court's own motion the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 is VACATED, to be reset by separate order. Text entry order. (lns) (Entered: 02/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's #12 Motion to Vacate Report of Parties Planning Meeting #11 is granted. The second #11 Report of Parties Planning Meeting filed in error is vacated. Text entry order. (mr) (Entered: 02/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MOTION to Vacate #11 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by Plaintiff Michael D. Braun. (Myers, Christopher) (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) **VACATED Pursuant to DE 13 ** REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher) Modified on 2/11/2019 (mr). (Entered: 02/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2 from Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins and Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (lhc) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Steinhofer, Rachel) (Entered: 01/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) DISCLOSURE of Corporate filed by Total Fleet Service, LLC.(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ANSWER to Complaint by Total Fleet Service, LLC.(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 01/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties (Standard Track). (mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel to appear in person.(mr) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • *NEW CASE* Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of Total Fleet Service, LLC (Steinhofer, Rachel) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of Total Fleet Service, LLC (Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3769519.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1811-CT-000670, filed by Total Fleet Service, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stites, Anthony) (Entered: 12/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.