This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:55:27 (UTC).

Branum v. Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Branum filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Kimberly E. West. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00281

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly E. West

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Terry Branum

Defendant

Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Gregg J. Lytle

Attorney at McDaniel Acord, PLLC

9343 E 95Th Ct

Tulsa, OK 74133

Melissa E. Oxford

Attorney at McDaniel Acord, PLLC

9343 E 95Th Ct

Tulsa, OK 74133

Defendant Attorneys

Kristin M. Simpsen

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

Elizabeth Bowersox

Attorney at McAfee & Taft (OKC)

211 N Robinson, 10Th Flr

Oklahoma City, OK 73102-7103

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Settlement Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Settlement Conference Statements due 3/12/2019. (tmb, Chambers) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#15

(#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2018. Exhibit List due by 3/20/2019. Witness List due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2019. Discovery due by 5/6/2019. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/23/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#14

(#14) MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

13 #2

Defendant's Consent

13 #1

Plaintiff's Consent

#13

(#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#12

(#12) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC ;(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#11

(#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Bowersox, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

#9

(#9) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Terry Branum ;(Oxford, Melissa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melissa E. Oxford on behalf of Terry Branum (Oxford, Melissa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Bowersox on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Bowersox, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#6

(#6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC Responses due by 9/14/2018(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

5 #1

Consent/Reassignment Form

#5

(#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 9/27/2018 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristin M. Simpsen on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

2 #5

Exhibit 5 - Order Granting Motion

2 #2

Exhibit 2 - Petition

2 #1

Exhibit 1 - Docket Sheet

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Settlement Conference set for 3/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in Chambers, Room 425, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Steven P. Shreder. Settlement Conference Statements due 3/12/2019. (tmb, Chambers) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting scheduling order date(s): Amended Pleadings due by 10/13/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 10/13/2018. Exhibit List due by 3/20/2019. Witness List due by 3/20/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 4/29/2019. Discovery due by 5/6/2019. Jury Instructions, Voir Dire & Trial Briefs due by 5/23/2019. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 5/23/2019. Pretrial Conference set for 5/30/2019 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, Room 432, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West.(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTES of Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE by Court Clerk of Consent by the Parties to Proceed Before the United States Magistrate. In accordance with 28 U.S.C., Section 636(c), the Magistrate Judge will exercise complete jurisdiction over all matters in this case including trial. (With attachments)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) REPLY to Response to Motion (Re: #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC ;(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Bowersox, Elizabeth) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (#10) MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West - This Court acknowledges the random assignment of this case. By separate electronic mail transmission from the Clerk of this Court, the parties have been provided the Notice of Assignment to a United States Magistrate Judge With Consent to Proceed or District Judge Option form for completion and submission. If you have not received a copy of the Notice from the Clerk, a copy may be obtained on this District's website at www.oked.uscourts.gov under the tab for Forms and is titled Consent or District Judge Option Form. The parties shall submit a completed Consent/District Judge Option form by SEPTEMBER 25, 2018. (adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) RESPONSE to Motion (Re: #6 Partial MOTION to Dismiss ) by Terry Branum ;(Oxford, Melissa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Melissa E. Oxford on behalf of Terry Branum (Oxford, Melissa) (Entered: 09/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Bowersox on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Bowersox, Elizabeth) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Partial MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC Responses due by 9/14/2018(Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West setting Telephonic Scheduling Conference for 9/27/2018 at 10:15 AM in Chambers, Room 430, US Courthouse, 5th & Okmulgee, Muskogee, OK before Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. The Court will initiate the conference call. Joint Status Report due by 9/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Consent/Reassignment Form)(adw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Kristin M. Simpsen on behalf of Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 8/24/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1201354 (Re: #2 Notice of Removal ) by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (Simpsen, Kristin) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk. Defendant is directed to pay the $400 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party (Filing Fee due by 8/31/2018) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of Removal from Okmulgee County District Court, case number 18-CJ-111 by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (With attachments) (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against Orscheln Farm and Home, LLC by Terry Branum (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.