This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/17/2021 at 09:55:23 (UTC).

Bragi GmbH et al v. OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd

Case Summary

On 05/18/2018 Bragi GmbH filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against OnePlus Technology Shenzhen Co , Ltd. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joseph C. Spero and Saundra Brown Armstrong. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-02972

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Joseph C. Spero

Saundra Brown Armstrong

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and Counter Defendants

Bragi North America, LLC

Bragi GmbH

Bragi Store, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Christina J. Moser

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

127 Public Square, Suite 2000

Cleveland, OH 44114

Teresa Carey Chow

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler LLP

11601 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90025-0509

William Carl Bergmann

1050 Connecticut Avenue, Nw, Suite 1100

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Julia Anne Matheson

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

55 Thirteenth St, Nw

Washington, DC 20004

Anna Kurian Shaw

555 Thirteenth Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20004

Andrew J. Gray, IV

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Corey Ray Houmand

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP

1400 Page Mill Road

Palo Alto, CA 94304

Steven Mark Levitan

Attorney at Hogan Lovells US LLP

4085 Campbell Avenue, Suite 100

Menlo Park, CA 94025

 

Court Documents

#62

#61

#60

RESTRICTED

#59

#57

#56

#55

9 #4

Exhibit 3 USPTO Record

9 #3

Exhibit 2 OnePlus Website Careers

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#2

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

230 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket#Electronic filing error. Judge name or initials are incorrect. Counsel need not re-file the document, but should reference the correct judge name/initials on future filings. Corre cted by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re: #62 Stipulation filed by Bragi Store, LLC, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi GmbH, OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. (ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2019) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#62) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC, and OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 4/23/2019) Modified on 4/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/24/2019 (ajsS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#61) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on March 21, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 4/15/2019) (Entered: 04/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#60) Sealed Transcript of Proceedings held on 3-21-2019, before Judge Elizabeth Laporte. Court Reporter Ana M. Dub, ana_dub@cand.uscourts.gov. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy,any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Redaction Request due 4/26/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/6/2019. (amdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2019) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#59) TRANSCRIPT ORDER for proceedings held on 03/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte by OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd, for Court Reporter Ana Dub. (Gray, Andrew) (Filed on 3/29/2019) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • Docket(#58) Minute Entry for settlement conference held on 3/21/2019 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Case settled and the terms of the agreement were stated on the record. Counsel of record shall have access to the transcript.Court Reporter: Ana Dub (SEALED)Plaintiff Attorneys: Christina Moser and William Bergmann Defendant Attorneys: Yalei Sun and Andrew Gary (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 3/21/2019) Modified on 3/22/2019 (shyS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 03/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#57) NOTICE of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. A Settlement Conference is set for 3/21/2019 at 9:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom E, 15th Floor. (shyS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2019) (Entered: 02/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketCASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte for Settlement (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2019) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#56) Order by Judge Saundra Brown Armstrong granting #55 Stipulation selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge.(dtmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2019) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#55) STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Early Settlement Conference with a Magistrate Judge by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC and OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 2/22/2019) Modified on 2/25/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. Service waived by OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd waiver sent on 6/25/2018, answer due 9/24/2018. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 7/2/2018) (Entered: 07/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION Alternate Service filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2018 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Responses due by 6/21/2018. Replies due by 6/28/2018. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christina J. Moser, #2 Exhibit 1 OnePlus Website About Us, #3 Exhibit 2 OnePlus Website Careers, #4 Exhibit 3 USPTO Record, #5 Exhibit 4 Photos of Continued Infringement, #6 Exhibit 5 May 20 Email, #7 Exhibit 6 Declaration of Reasonable Diligence, #8 Exhibit 7 PACER Results, #9 Exhibit 8 Pei Article, #10 Exhibit 9 Fowler Bio)(Moser, Christina) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC.. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 6/7/2018) (Entered: 06/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) REPORT on the filing of an action regarding Trademark Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 8/10/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/17/2018 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom G, 15th Floor. (gbaS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2018) (Entered: 05/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 5/21/2018) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2018
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 6/4/2018. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2018) (Entered: 05/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 5/18/2018) (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co., Ltd (Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number 0971-12368006.). Filed by Bragi GmbH, Bragi North America, LLC, Bragi Store, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Moser, Christina) (Filed on 5/18/2018) Modified on 5/25/2018 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 05/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bragi North America, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OnePlus Technology (Shenzhen) Co Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julia Anne Matheson(Designation Retained)