This case was last updated from PACER on 03/22/2019 at 00:50:50 (UTC).

BRADY v. DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/20/2018 BRADY filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Leda D. Wettre and Madeline Cox Arleo. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03825

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New Jersey District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Leda D. Wettre

Presiding Judge

Madeline Cox Arleo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELENA V. BRADY

Rahway, NJ 07065

Defendant

DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

MITCHELL SCOTT KURTZ

Attorney at PARKER IBRAHIM & BERG LLP

270 Davidson Avenue 5Th Floor

Somerset, NJ 08873

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Letter. (KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL SCOTT KURTZ on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and without costs against any party. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/29/2018. (sm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

#5

(#5) Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. (sm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit B- Assignment of Judgment

#3

(#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sms) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

#2

(#2) ORDER, that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs, and the Clerk shall filed the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; the Clerk shall issue a summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 07/27/2018. (sms)(n/m) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

7 #1

Certificate of Service

1 #2

Application IFP

#8

(#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY. (KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

1 #3

Additional attachment to IFP

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Additional attachment to IFP, #4 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit B- Assignment of Judgment)(sms) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

#6

(#6) Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 11/26/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (aa, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

1 #4

Exhibit A-Mortgage

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE and without costs against any party. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 11/29/2018. (sm) (Entered: 11/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY. (KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by MITCHELL SCOTT KURTZ on behalf of DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Call for dismissal Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 4(m). Motion set for 11/26/2018 before Judge Madeline Cox Arleo. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (aa, ) (Entered: 11/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Letter. (KURTZ, MITCHELL) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Defendants' Notice of Withdrawal of Motion. (sm) (Entered: 08/23/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CLERK'S LETTER: Transmittal of USM 285 Forms. (sms) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • COMPLAINT against DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL BANK TRUST COMPANY, IFP GRANTED, filed by ELENA V. BRADY.(sms) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER, that Plaintiff be permitted to proceed without prepayment of fees or costs, and the Clerk shall filed the Complaint without prepayment of the filing fee; the Clerk shall issue a summons and the U.S. Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, and this order upon Defendants as directed by Plaintiff. All costs of service shall be advanced by the United States; etc. Signed by Judge Madeline Cox Arleo on 07/27/2018. (sms)(n/m) (Entered: 07/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint Received. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Application IFP, #3 Additional attachment to IFP, #4 Exhibit A-Mortgage, #5 Exhibit B- Assignment of Judgment)(sms) (Entered: 03/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.