This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2018 at 08:10:20 (UTC).

Bradford et al v. Bank of Eastern Oregon

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 Bradford filed a Bankruptcy - Withdrawal lawsuit against Bank of Eastern Oregon. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Idaho District. The Judge overseeing this case is B. Lynn Winmill. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00397

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Withdrawal

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Idaho District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

B. Lynn Winmill

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs and In Re

Ryan Clifford Bradford

Judy Kay Bradford

Defendant

Bank of Eastern Oregon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

William A Morrow

Attorney at MORROW & FISCHER, PLLC

332 N. Broadmore Way, Suite 102

Nampa, ID 83687

D Blair Clark

Attorney at Law Offices of D. Blair Clark PLLC

1513 Tyrell Lane, Suite 130

Boise, ID 83706

George W. Breitsameter

Attorney at Morrow & Fischer Pllc

332 N. Broadmore Way, Ste. 102

Nampa, ID 83687

Defendant Attorney

Trevor L Hart

Attorney at PERRY LAW PC

Po Box 637

Boise, ID 83701-0637

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 11/19/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

#10

(#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Clark, D)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Breitsameter, George)

#8

(#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/24/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

#7

(#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford (Breitsameter, George)

#5

(#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/17/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

4 #1

Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue

#4

(#4) MOTION to Change Venue George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Breitsameter, George)

#3

(#3) REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)

#2

(#2) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 9/21/2018.(cjs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

1 #2

Bankruptcy Docket Sheet

1 #1

Adversary Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference, D Blair Clark, George W. Breitsameter, William A Morrow appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. (Initially filed in Bankruptcy Court 8/17/2018. Motion Filing fee $181 paid in Bankruptcy Court. Receipt # 6792992.) (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(cjs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 11/19/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting #9 unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The Court retroactively grants this motion. The reply is due October 26, 2018. Signed by Judge B. Lynn Winmill. (mls)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Clark, D)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #8 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 11/14/2018 (Breitsameter, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/24/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford (Breitsameter, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference (Supplemental Response) filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 10/17/2018.(Hart, Trevor)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Change Venue George W. Breitsameter appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. Responses due by 10/10/2018 (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue)(Breitsameter, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REPLY to Response to Motion re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford.(Breitsameter, George)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference filed by Bank of Eastern Oregon. Replies due by 9/21/2018.(cjs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION to Withdraw Reference, D Blair Clark, George W. Breitsameter, William A Morrow appearing for Plaintiffs Judy Kay Bradford, Ryan Clifford Bradford. (Initially filed in Bankruptcy Court 8/17/2018. Motion Filing fee $181 paid in Bankruptcy Court. Receipt # 6792992.) (Attachments: #1 Adversary Docket Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Docket Sheet)(cjs) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.