This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/16/2019 at 07:37:09 (UTC).

Boyd et al v. Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/18/2018 Boyd filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is George C Hanks, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-00433

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

George C Hanks, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jeff Boyd

Defendants

Furmanite America Inc

Algonquin Gas Transmission, LLC

Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

John Anthony Neuman

Attorney at Sosa-Morris Neuman Attorneys at Law

5612 Chaucer Dr

Houston, TX 77005

Michael Antonio Faillace

Attorney at Michael Faillace & Associates, P.C.

60 East 42Nd Street, Suite 4510

New York, NY 10165

Don Foty

Attorney at Kennedy Hodges, L.L.P.

4409 Montrose Blvd, Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

David Wayne Hodges

Attorney at Kennedy Hodges LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd, Ste 200

Houston, TX 77006

Rose Molina

Attorney at Kennedy Hodges, LLP

4409 Montrose Blvd., Suite 200

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Evan Benjamin Citron

1745 Broadway, 22Nd Fl

New York, NY 10019

David Brian Feldman

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C. (NY)

1745 Broadway, 22Nd Fl.

New York, NY 10019

Timothy M. Watson

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

700 Louisiana Street, Suite 3700

Houston, TX 77002

Dennis A Clifford

Attorney at The Clifford Law Firm, PLLC

712 Main St., Suite 900

Houston, TX 77002

Meredith-Anne M Berger

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP (NYC)

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

Howard Mark Wexler

Attorney at Seyfarth Shaw LLP

620 Eighth Avenue

New York, NY 10018-1405

 

Court Documents

#103

#102

#101

#100

#99

98 #1

*Restricted*

#98

#97

#96

#95

#93

#92

#91

#89

#88

87 #1

Exhibit 1 - Settlement Agreement & Release

#87

131 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER (Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) ORDER on Initial Discovery Protocols for FLSA.(Signed by Judge George C Hanks, Jr) Parties notified.(dperez, 3) (Entered: 02/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) NOTICE of Resetting. Parties notified. Status Conference RESET for 3/1/2019 at 01:30 PM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3) (Entered: 02/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) NOTICE of Setting. Parties notified. Status Conference set for 2/13/2019 at 11:15 AM by telephone before Judge George C Hanks Jr, filed. (jegonzalez, 3) (Entered: 01/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) Case electronically transferred in from New York Southern. Case Number 7:16-cv-06902. (ltien, 4) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • CASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Southern District of Texas. (mml) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#97) ORDER: Accordingly, it is HEREBY ORDERED: 1. The parties' time to complete the deposition of third party witness Richard Horn is extended to February 11, 2019. 2. The parties' application to transfer this case to the Southern District of Texas is GRANTED, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404. 3. All scheduled conferences or other court appearances before Judge Briccetti, including the status conference set for December 14, 2018, are cancelled. The Clerk is instructed to transfer this case to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Texas. SO ORDERED. (Deposition due by 2/11/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/11/2018) (mml) Transmission to Office of the Clerk of Court for processing. (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Subpoena to Testify at a Deposition, Plaintiff's Deposition Notice served on Richard Horn, IV on 11/29/2018. Service was accepted by Richard Horn, IV. Document filed by Jeff Boyd. (Foty, Don) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Don J. Foty dated December 10, 2018 re: Status of discovery. Document filed by Jeff Boyd.(Foty, Don) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
109 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Don J. Foty to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12814754. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jeff Boyd.(Foty, Don) Modified on 9/29/2016 (wb). (Entered: 09/29/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (vf) (Entered: 09/08/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spectra Energy Operating Company LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jeff Boyd. (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 09/07/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Case Designated ECF. (vf) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. (vf) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (vf) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Antonio Faillace to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated 2016. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated 2016. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet. (vf) (Entered: 09/02/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael) Modified on 9/2/2016 (vf). (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Spectra Energy Operating Company, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-12717321)Document filed by Jeff Boyd(on behalf of himself and on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael) (Entered: 09/01/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FURMANITE AMERICA INC (CORPORATION) is a litigant

Latest cases where ALGONQUIN GAS TRANSMISSION, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Spectra Energy Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David Brian Feldman