This case was last updated from PACER on 01/18/2019 at 07:40:45 (UTC).

Bowen v. Adidas America Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/19/2018 Bowen filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against Adidas America Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Carolina District. The Judge overseeing this case is Joseph F Anderson, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-03118

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Carolina District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joseph F Anderson, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brian Bowen, II

Defendants

Thomas Gassnola

James Gatto

Adidas America Inc

Christian Dawkins

Christopher Rivers

Merl Code

Munish Sood

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W Mullins McLeod, Jr

Attorney at McLeod Law Group LLC

Po Box 21624

Charleston, SC 29413

Harry Cooper Wilson, III

Attorney at McLeod Law Group LLC

Po Box 21624

Charleston, SC 29413

Defendant Attorneys

Deborah B Barbier

Attorney at Barbier Law Office

1811 Pickens Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Mary Lucille Dinkins

Attorney at Wyche PA

801 Gervais Street, Suite B

Columbia, SC 29201

Matthew T Richardson

Attorney at Wyche PA

801 Gervais Street, Suite B

Columbia, SC 29201

Cory E Manning

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Wesley Tyler Moran

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLP (Cola)

Meridian Building, 17Th Floor, 1320 Main Street

Columbia, SC 29201

Terry Allan Finger

Attorney at Finger Fraser and Andrews

Po Box 24005

Hilton Head Island, SC 29925

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Dinkins, Mary) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Richardson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

#14

(#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE by James Gatto. Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barbier, Deborah) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah B Barbier on behalf of James Gatto (Barbier, Deborah) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

12 #1

Affidavit Service on Adidas America, Inc.

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Bowen, II. Adidas America Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Adidas America, Inc.)(McLeod, W) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

#10

(#10) Summons Issued as to Christopher Rivers. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#9

(#9) Summons Issued as to Thomas Gassnola. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued as to Munish Sood. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Christian Dawkins. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Merl Code. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to James Gatto. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to Adidas America Inc. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#3

(#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brian Bowen, II.(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Federal Criminal Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Louisville Agreement with Adidas

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christian Dawkins, Thomas Gassnola, James Gatto, Christopher Rivers, Munish Sood ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8114197.), filed by Brian Bowen, II. Service due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Louisville Agreement with Adidas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Federal Criminal Complaint)(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) TEXT ORDER granting #16 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or otherwise respond to plaintiff's complaint Adidas America Inc answer due 2/5/2019; Merl Code answer due 2/5/2019; Christopher Rivers answer due 2/5/2019. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/7/19.(mflo, ) Modified on 1/8/2019 to add text (mflo, ). (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) TEXT ORDER granting #14 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE as to defendant James Gatto; answer due 2/5/2019. Directed by Honorable Joseph F Anderson, Jr on 1/7/19.(mflo, ) (Entered: 01/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lucille Dinkins on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Dinkins, Mary) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christopher Rivers. Response to Motion due by 1/18/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Richardson, Matthew) Modified on 1/7/2019 to add text(mflo, ). (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew T Richardson on behalf of Adidas America Inc (Richardson, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer OR OTHERWISE MOVE by James Gatto. Response to Motion due by 1/14/2019. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Barbier, Deborah) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah B Barbier on behalf of James Gatto (Barbier, Deborah) (Entered: 12/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Brian Bowen, II. Adidas America Inc served on 11/26/2018, answer due 12/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Service on Adidas America, Inc.)(McLeod, W) (Entered: 12/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Summons Issued as to Christopher Rivers. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Summons Issued as to Thomas Gassnola. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Summons Issued as to Munish Sood. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Summons Issued as to Christian Dawkins. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Merl Code. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to James Gatto. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Adidas America Inc. (mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Brian Bowen, II.(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Adidas America Inc, Merl Code, Christian Dawkins, Thomas Gassnola, James Gatto, Christopher Rivers, Munish Sood ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0420-8114197.), filed by Brian Bowen, II. Service due by 2/19/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Louisville Agreement with Adidas, #2 Exhibit 2 - Federal Criminal Complaint)(mdea ) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.