This case was last updated from PACER on 01/15/2020 at 15:53:43 (UTC).

Bourque et al v. Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/16/2018 Bourque filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr and John W. deGravelles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-01018

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Louisiana Middle District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr

Presiding Judge

John W. deGravelles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Brook Bourque

Tony Bourque

Defendant

Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffry L. Sanford

Post Office Box 14263, 8550 United Plaza Blvd, Suite 702

Baton Rouge, LA 70898-4263

Defendant Attorneys

Lance B. Williams

Attorney at McCranie, Sistrunk, Anzelmo, Hardy, Maxwell & McDaniel- COV

195 Greenbriar Boulevard, Suite 200

Covington, LA 70433

Joshua Henry Dierker

Attorney at McCranie Sistrunk Anzelmo Hardy McDaniel & Welch

Suite 200, 195 Greenbriar Blvd.

Covington, LA 70433

Samantha N. Babin

Attorney at McCranie Sistrunk Anzelmo Hardy McDaniel & Welch, LLC

195 Greenbriar Blvd, Suite 200

Covington, LA 70433

 

Court Documents

1 #2

Exhibit A - STATE COURT PETITION

#5

(#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

1 #1

Attachment CIVIL COVER SHEET

#7

(#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. The scheduling conference set for January 17, 2019 is CANCELLED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/31/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 2/18/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 4/30/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/19/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/9/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/20/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 - 12/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/14/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

1 #3

Exhibit B - SERVICE OF PROCESS

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT FOR THE PARISH OF ASCENSION, Case Number 123484. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863325), filed by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit A - STATE COURT PETITION, #3 Exhibit B - SERVICE OF PROCESS, #4 Exhibit C - STATE COURT RECORD, #5 Exhibit D - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL)(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

#2

(#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc..(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#6

(#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

3 #1

Exhibit A - STATE COURT RECORD

#4

(#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/5/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#8

(#8) MOTION for Joshua H. Dierker to Withdraw as Attorney by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

1 #4

Exhibit C - STATE COURT RECORD

10 #1

Proposed Pleading;

1 #5

Exhibit D - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL

#10

(#10) MOTION to Enroll Samantha B. Simmons as Additional Attorney by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Enroll Co-Counsel of Record. Attorney Samantha N. Babin is enrolled a co-counsel for Defendant Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 8/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (SGO) (Entered: 08/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #10 MOTION to Enroll Samantha B. Simmons as Additional Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (NLT) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Enroll Samantha B. Simmons as Additional Attorney by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading;)(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 08/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER granting #8 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel of Record. Joshua H. Dierker is withdrawn as counsel of record for defendant, AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.,in this matter. Lance B. Williams and the firm of McCranie, Sistrunk, Anzelmo, Hardy, McDaniel & Welch, LLC remain as counsel of record for defendant, AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 3/28/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no hyperlink or PDF document associated with this entry.) (JSL) (Entered: 03/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION(S) REFERRED: #8 MOTION for Joshua H. Dierker to Withdraw as Attorney . This motion is now pending before the USMJ. (ELW) (Entered: 03/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) MOTION for Joshua H. Dierker to Withdraw as Attorney by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 03/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SCHEDULING ORDER: In accordance with FRCP 16(b), the following discovery deadlines are established. The scheduling conference set for January 17, 2019 is CANCELLED. Amended Pleadings due by 4/15/2019. Discovery due by 2/18/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Witness List due by 12/31/2019. Defendant`s Expert Witness List due by 1/31/2020. Plaintiff`s Expert Reports due by 1/15/2020. Defendant`s Expert Reports due by 2/18/2020. Discovery from Experts due by 4/30/2020. Motions shall be filed by 6/1/2020. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 9/21/2020. Pretrial Conference set for 10/8/2020 at 01:30 PM in chambers before Judge John W. deGravelles. Motions In Limine shall be filed by 10/19/2020. Affidavit of Settlement Efforts due by 11/9/2020. Joint jury instructions, voir dire, verdict forms, and trial briefs due by 11/20/2020. Jury Trial set for 12/7/2020 - 12/10/2020 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 1 before Judge John W. deGravelles. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 1/14/2019. (EDC) (Entered: 01/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Joint STATUS REPORT by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 01/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Williams, Lance) (Entered: 12/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER: Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois Jr. Status Report due by 1/3/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Richard L. Bourgeois, Jr. on 12/5/2018. (JSL) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Listing Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) and Local Rule 3.2 to #1 Notice of Removal by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - STATE COURT RECORD)(Williams, Lance) Modified on 12/3/2018 to edit the text (KAH). (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc..(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 23RD JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT FOR THE PARISH OF ASCENSION, Case Number 123484. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAMDC-1863325), filed by Amtrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment CIVIL COVER SHEET, #2 Exhibit A - STATE COURT PETITION, #3 Exhibit B - SERVICE OF PROCESS, #4 Exhibit C - STATE COURT RECORD, #5 Exhibit D - NOTICE TO STATE COURT AND ADVERSE PARTY OF FILING OF REMOVAL)(Williams, Lance) (Entered: 11/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.