This case was last updated from PACER on 01/20/2019 at 08:11:53 (UTC).

Boucher v. Aetna

Case Summary

On 11/21/2018 Boucher filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Aetna. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Rhode Island District. The Judges overseeing this case are Patricia A. Sullivan and John J. McConnell, Jr.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-00638

  • Filing Date:

    11/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rhode Island District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Patricia A. Sullivan

Presiding Judge

John J. McConnell, Jr.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Catherine Boucher

Defendant

Aetna Life Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Vicki J. Bejma

Attorney at Robinson & Clapham

123 Dyer Street, Suite 135

Providence, RI 02903

Defendant Attorney

Scott K. Pomeroy

Attorney at Ogletree Deakins

One Boston Place, Suite3500

Boston, MA 02108

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Pomeroy on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

#7

(#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

6 #1

Exhibit

#6

(#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Boucher. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#4

(#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Catherine Boucher (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#2

(#2) Summons Request filed by Catherine Boucher. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1290058 ), filed by Catherine Boucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aetna Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for Aetna Life Insurance Company.. (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Scott K. Pomeroy on behalf of Aetna Life Insurance Company (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER entering #7 Stipulation to extend time to answer; Reset Deadlines: Aetna Life Insurance Company answer due 1/16/2019 - So Ordered by District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/6/2018. (Barletta, Barbara) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Pomeroy, Scott) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Catherine Boucher. All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 12/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Catherine Boucher (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Request filed by Catherine Boucher. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1290058 ), filed by Catherine Boucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Aetna Life Insurance Company. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • Case assigned to District Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Potter, Carrie) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Vicki J. Bejma on behalf of Catherine Boucher (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Request filed by Catherine Boucher. (Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 400.00, receipt number 0103-1290058 ), filed by Catherine Boucher. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet cover sheet)(Bejma, Vicki) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less