This case was last updated from PACER on 01/13/2018 at 02:40:46 (UTC).

Bosco Legal Services, Inc. v. Hiscox Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2018 Bosco Legal Services, Inc filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Hiscox Inc . This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Shashi H. Kewalramani and George H. Wu. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-00048

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Shashi H. Kewalramani

Presiding Judge

George H. Wu

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Bosco Legal Services, Inc.

Defendants

Hiscox Inc.

Lloyd s Syndicate 3624

Does 1 through 100, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Boyd Jensen

Attorney at Garrett and Jensen

3390 Orange Street

Riverside, CA 92501

Defendant Attorneys

Kathryn Courtney Ashton

Attorney at Clyde and Co LLP

101 Second Steeet 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

Gabrielle Ana Hollingsworth

Attorney at Clyde and Co US LLP

101 Second Street, 24Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94105

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#6

(#6) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit -B as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#7

(#7) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit - C as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#8

(#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency, re Notice (Other) #3 served on 01/09/2018. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#2

(#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency identifying Lloyd's Syndicate 3624 (Hiscox) as Corporate Parent. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#3

(#3) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL* (INITIATING DOCUMENT) incorrectly filed as NOTICE (Other) of Removal to USDC filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) Modified by Clerk on 1/10/2018 (esa). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#4

(#4) DECLARATION of Kathryn C. Ashton re Notice (Other) #3 of Removal to United States District Court filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

#5

(#5) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit - A as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE executed by Plaintiff Bosco Legal Services, Inc., upon Defendant Hiscox Inc. served on 12/11/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CSC, Agent of Service of Process, in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Original Summons NOT returned. (esa) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants Does 1 through 100, inclusive, Hiscox Inc., filed by plaintiff Bosco Legal Services, Inc.. (esa) (Entered: 01/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency, re Notice (Other) #3 served on 01/09/2018. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID for new civil case. Receipt No. 0973-21071280 for $400 filing fee. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit - C as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit -B as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXHIBIT Filed filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. Exhibit - A as to Declaration #4 . (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DECLARATION of Kathryn C. Ashton re Notice (Other) #3 of Removal to United States District Court filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) *NOTICE OF REMOVAL* (INITIATING DOCUMENT) incorrectly filed as NOTICE (Other) of Removal to USDC filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) Modified by Clerk on 1/10/2018 (esa). (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency identifying Lloyd's Syndicate 3624 (Hiscox) as Corporate Parent. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hiscox Inc. dba Hiscox Insurance Agency. (Ashton, Kathryn) (Entered: 01/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.