This case was last updated from PACER on 09/19/2019 at 18:04:45 (UTC).

BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN v. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 08/07/2018 BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CYNTHIA M. RUFE and CHAD F. KENNEY. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-03344

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

CYNTHIA M. RUFE

CHAD F. KENNEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN

Defendants and Counter Claimants

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO.

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC

VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.

VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC.

VERIZON NORTH LLC

VERIZON ONLINE, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

CHARLES J. FONZONE

Attorney at Gross McGinley LLP

33 South Seventh Street, P.O. Box 4060

Allentown, PA 18105-4180

VICTOR F. CAVACINI

Attorney at GROSS, MCGINLEY, LLP

33 S. 7Th St., P.O. Box 4060

Allentown, PA 18105

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

STEVEN A. HABER

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPEL LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

MICHAEL F. EICHERT

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPEL LLP

One Penn Center, 19Th Floor, 1617 John F. Kennedy Blvd

Philadelphia, PA 19103-4797

ERIC B. FREEDMAN

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPEL, LLP

1500 Market Street, Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 19102

THOMAS A. LEONARD

Attorney at OBERMAYER REBMANN MAXWELL & HIPPEL LLP

1500 Market St Suite 3400

Philadelphia, PA 1910

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) STIPULATION AND ORDER: THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATED DECEMBER 21, 2018 IS MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: 1. REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS SHALL BE DILE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2019; 2. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 21, 2019; 3. ALL OTHER DEADLINES SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/26/2019. 7/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#29

(#29) ORDER: THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 24) IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. (ECF NO. 25) IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/7/2019. 6/7/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

#28

(#28) Response re #27 Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiff's Response to Notice Dated June 6, 2019 by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. (CAVACINI, VICTOR) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

#27

(#27) NOTICE: WITH THE COURT ACCEPTING AS TRUE THE STATEMENT THAT "[T]HE PRESENCE OF BOROUGH EMPLOYEES AT THE DEPOSITION OF VERIZON WITNESSES IS IMPORTANT TO THE EVIDENTIARY PROCESS. GIVEN THE LAYERS OF INFORMATION TO SORT OUT DETERMINING EXACTLY WHAT EVIDENCE THE DEFENDANT RELIES ON IS CRITICAL" CONTAINED IN PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 24), PLAINTIFF IS TO FILE A NOTIFICATION ON ECF NO LATER THAN 9:00 A.M. ON FRIDAY, JUNE 7, 2019 FOR EACH KNOWN DEPONENT OF THE PARTIES AT THIS TIME. THIS NOTIFICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MUST CONTAIN THE NAME OF THE ADDITIONAL INDIVIDUALS THAT WILL APPEAR AT THE DEPOSITIONS FOR EACH KNOWN DEPONENT, THEIR POSITION, TITLE, EMPLOYER, AND NECESSITY FOR THEM BEING PRESENT AT THE DEPOSITION. COUNSEL SHOULD BE READY TO DISCUSS THE NECESSITY OF THESE WITNESSES AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING ON JUNE 7, 2019. ALL COUNSEL MOVING FORWARD SHALL ENSURE THAT THERE IS ADEQUATE AND COMFORTABLE SPACE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS. IF THE PARTIES CAN COME TO A RESOLUTION PRIOR TO TOMORROW MORNING, THEY SHOULD NOTIFY THE COURT AND THE CASE WILL BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CALENDAR. (sme, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

26 #3

Exhibit Exhibits A & B attached to Memorandum

26 #2

Memorandum Memorandum in Opposition

24 #5

Exhibit

24 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#24

(#24) MOTION for Protective Order filed by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(HABER, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.(EICHERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#5

(#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING ORDER MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED, AND SUCH RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/20/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/16/18. 10/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#4

(#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED, AND SUCH RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/20/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. EICHERT on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(EICHERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (CAVACINI, VICTOR) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.(EICHERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) STIPULATION AND ORDER: THAT THE SCHEDULING ORDER DATED DECEMBER 21, 2018 IS MODIFIED AS FOLLOWS: 1. REBUTTAL EXPERT REPORTS SHALL BE DILE NO LATER THAN SEPTEMBER 30, 2019; 2. EXPERT DISCOVERY SHALL BE COMPLETED NO LATER THAN OCTOBER 21, 2019; 3. ALL OTHER DEADLINES SHALL REMAIN UNCHANGED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 7/26/2019. 7/26/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) ORDER: THAT DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 24) IS DENIED AS MOOT. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT THE HEARING SCHEDULED FOR JUNE 7, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. (ECF NO. 25) IS CANCELLED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/7/2019. 6/7/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) Response re #27 Notice (Other),,,, Plaintiff's Response to Notice Dated June 6, 2019 by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. (CAVACINI, VICTOR) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE: WITH THE COURT ACCEPTING AS TRUE THE STATEMENT THAT "[T]HE PRESENCE OF BOROUGH EMPLOYEES AT THE DEPOSITION OF VERIZON WITNESSES IS IMPORTANT TO THE EVIDENTIARY PROCESS. GIVEN THE LAYERS OF INFORMATION TO SORT OUT DETERMINING EXACTLY WHAT EVIDENCE THE DEFENDANT RELIES ON IS CRITICAL" CONTAINED IN PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 24), PLAINTIFF IS TO FILE A NOTIFICATION ON ECF NO LATER THAN 9:00 A.M. ON FRIDAY, JUNE 7, 2019 FOR EACH KNOWN DEPONENT OF THE PARTIES AT THIS TIME. THIS NOTIFICATION FILED BY PLAINTIFF MUST CONTAIN THE NAME OF THE ADDITIONAL INDIVIDUALS THAT WILL APPEAR AT THE DEPOSITIONS FOR EACH KNOWN DEPONENT, THEIR POSITION, TITLE, EMPLOYER, AND NECESSITY FOR THEM BEING PRESENT AT THE DEPOSITION. COUNSEL SHOULD BE READY TO DISCUSS THE NECESSITY OF THESE WITNESSES AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING ON JUNE 7, 2019. ALL COUNSEL MOVING FORWARD SHALL ENSURE THAT THERE IS ADEQUATE AND COMFORTABLE SPACE FOR THE DEPOSITIONS. IF THE PARTIES CAN COME TO A RESOLUTION PRIOR TO TOMORROW MORNING, THEY SHOULD NOTIFY THE COURT AND THE CASE WILL BE REMOVED FROM THE COURT'S CALENDAR. (sme, ) (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) ANSWER re #24 MOTION for Protective Order filed by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum Memorandum in Opposition, #3 Exhibit Exhibits A & B attached to Memorandum, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(CAVACINI, VICTOR) Modified on 6/6/2019 (lisad, ). (Entered: 06/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) ORDER: THAT A RULE IS DIRECTED UPON PLAINTIFF TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE REQUESTED RELIEF IN DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER (ECF NO. 24) SHOULD NOT BE GRANTED. A HEARING WILL BE HELD ON FRIDAY, JUNE 7, 2019 AT 10:00 A.M. BEFORE THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY IN COURTROOM 6A, 601 MARKET STREET, PHILADELPHIA, PA 19106. PARTIES SHOULD CONFER BEFORE JUNE 7, 2019 AND NOTIFY CHAMBERS IF THIS ISSUE IS RESOLVED BEFORE THE SCHEDULED HEARING. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 6/4/2019. 6/4/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 06/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) MOTION for Protective Order filed by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.Memorandum, Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(HABER, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/31/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE of Appearance by STEVEN A. HABER on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC with Certificate of Service (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(HABER, STEVEN) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) ORDER: THAT PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF NO. 18) IS DENIED. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/17/2019. 5/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (sme, ) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY ON 5/17/2019. 5/17/2019 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sme, ) (Main Document 21 replaced on 8/5/2019 per Chambers) (lisad, ). (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER THAT THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED FROM THE HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE TO THE HONORABLE CHAD F. KENNEY FOR ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS. SIGNED BY CLERK OF COURT KATE BARKMAN, CLERK OF COURT ON 11/26/2018. 11/26/2018 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nd, ) Modified on 11/26/2018 (nd, ). (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER THAT A RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL BE HELD BY TELEPHONE ON 12/11/2018, AT 10:30 AM. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 11/21/18. 11/21/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC.(EICHERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING ORDER MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED, AND SUCH RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/20/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/16/18. 10/16/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT THE TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION IN RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT IS EXTENDED, AND SUCH RESPONSIVE PLEADING OR MOTION SHALL BE FILED ON OR BEFORE 11/20/2018. SIGNED BY HONORABLE CYNTHIA M. RUFE ON 10/15/18. 10/15/18 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(ti, ) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL F. EICHERT on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC with Certificate of Service(EICHERT, MICHAEL) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC waiver sent on 8/16/2018, answer due 10/15/2018. (CAVACINI, VICTOR) (Entered: 09/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • Jury Trial Demanded by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. (dt) (Entered: 08/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • 6 Original Summons Issued as to VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC. Forwarded To: Counsel on 08/07/2018 (dt) (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., VERIZON NORTH LLC, VERIZON ONLINE, LLC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA CO., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, INC., VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC filed by BOROUGH OF QUAKERTOWN. (Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number APE004786) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(dt) Modified on 8/8/2018 (lisad, ). (Entered: 08/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Verizon North, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where VERIZON PENNSYLVANIA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Online LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Verizon Communications Inc. is a litigant