This case was last updated from PACER on 11/06/2018 at 07:08:02 (UTC).

BOOTH et al v. BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY et al

Case Summary

On 09/07/2018 BOOTH filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are M CASEY RODGERS and GARY R JONES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:18-CV-02079

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

M CASEY RODGERS

Referral Judge

GARY R JONES

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

SANDRA DALEY

SHEILA REDMON

CHRISTINE CROMWELL

DIANE PADGETT

CHRISTINA JEFFERY

NEIL PAGE

ANTHONY ERMI

JOANN UHRICH

MELISSA HAMILTON

RICHARD ELLIS

SHARLENE JOHNSON

TONI RAVEN

MICHEL STYERS

YVONNE LOPEZ

EVELYN MORSE

ELIZABETH MOZ

JOSEPH DINNER

LAURA KINNEY

DWIGHT WILLIAMS

Defendant

MCKESSON CORPORATION

40 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MICHAEL LOUIS KELLY

Attorney at Kirtland & Packard LLP

1638 South Pacific Coast Highway

Redondo Beach, CA 90277

BEHRAM V PAREKH

Attorney at KIRTLAND & PACKARD LLP - EL SEGUNDO CA

2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Suite300

El Segundo, CA 90245

RUTH THI RIZKALLA

Attorney at KIRTLAND & PACKARD - EL SEGUNDO CA

2041 Rosecrans Avenue, Third Floor

El Segundo, CA 90245

Other Attorneys

RYAN SCOTT GRAMACY

Attorney at Arnold and Porter Kaye Scholer LLP

Three Embarcadero Center, 10Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111-4024

Krista M. Enns

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

101 California Street

San Francisco, CA 94111

EDWARD W GERECKE

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS JORDEN ETC PA - TAMPA FL

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

CHARLES FRANKLIN BEALL, JR.

Attorney at MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA - PENSACOLA FL

Po Box 13290

Pensacola, FL 32591

DAVID JOSEPH WALZ

Attorney at CARLTON FIELDS JORDEN ETC PA - TAMPA FL

4221 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 1000

Tampa, FL 33607-5780

ANAND AGNESHWAR

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER LLP - NEW YORK NY

250 West 55Th Street

New York, NY 10019

MATTHEW A EISENSTEIN

Attorney at ARNOLD & PORTER LLP - WASHINGTON DC

601 Massachusetts Ave Nw

Washington, DC 20001

THOMAS LARRY HILL

Attorney at MOORE HILL & WESTMORELAND PA - PENSACOLA

Po Box 13290

Pensacola, FL 32591

LAUREN S COLTON

Attorney at HOGAN LOVELLS US LLP - BALTIMORE MD

100 International Drive, Suite 2000

Baltimore, MD 21202

 

Court Documents

17 #1

Exhibit A

#17

(#17) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF NONRESIDENT PLAINTIFFS FROM CALIFORNIA ACTIONS. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A are dismissed from the California Actions. Within 60 days of this Order, the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A may refile their claims in this MDL using Short Form complaints. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) RAY OWENS, DIANE PADGETT, SHEILA REDMON, MICHEL STYERS, GINETTE GIST and KATHARINE KNEEBULL terminated. (djb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

15 #1

*Restricted*

#15

(#15) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05114. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 14 received. Modified on 9/7/2018 (djb). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

#14

(#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

#12

(#12) ORDER RELATING CASE to case no 16-cv-0254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/5/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2018)

#10

(#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

#9

(#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

8 #1

Standing Order for All Judges

#8

(#8) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for All Judges) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

7 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#7

(#7) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568990. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12612248). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL OF NONRESIDENT PLAINTIFFS FROM CALIFORNIA ACTIONS. The claims of the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A are dismissed from the California Actions. Within 60 days of this Order, the Plaintiffs listed at Exhibit A may refile their claims in this MDL using Short Form complaints. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/1/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) RAY OWENS, DIANE PADGETT, SHEILA REDMON, MICHEL STYERS, GINETTE GIST and KATHARINE KNEEBULL terminated. (djb) (Entered: 10/01/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) NOTICE of Appearance by THOMAS LARRY HILL on behalf of BRISTOL-MYERS SQUIBB COMPANY (HILL, THOMAS) (Entered: 09/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re: #15 Case Transferred In - District Transfer, #1 Notice of Removal (djb) (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Case electronically transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 4:18-cv-05114. Original file with documents numbered 1 - 14 received. Modified on 9/7/2018 (djb). (Entered: 09/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. This action is transferred to the Northern District of Florida. (jjbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/6/2018 (jjbS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 09/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • (#13) Case reassigned to Judge Haywood S Gilliam, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge Judge William Alsup no longer assigned to the case. The parties are instructed that all future filings are to bear the initials HSG immediately after the case number. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (cpS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) Modified on 9/5/2018 (cpS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER RELATING CASE to case no 16-cv-0254-HSG. Signed by Judge Haywood S. Gilliam, Jr. on 9/5/2018. (ndrS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER GRANTING #9 STIPULATED REQUEST TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL. Signed by Judge William Alsup. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Certificate of Interested Entities by Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Otsuka America, Inc. for Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc.. Certification of Interested Entities or Persons Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 and Civ. L.R. 3-15 of Defendant Otsuka America Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Enns, Krista) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO STAY PROCEEDINGS PENDING TRANSFER TO THE ABILIFY MDL filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE SCHEDULING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE UPON REASSIGNMENT - Joint Case Management Statement due by 11/23/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 11:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 12, 19th Floor. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order for All Judges) (tlS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ORDER, Case reassigned to Judge William Alsup. Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James no longer assigned to the case. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/29/18. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • (#6) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company.. (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/28/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 11/22/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/29/2018 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom B, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maria-Elena James. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 9/4/2018. (bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certificate of Interested Entities by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company (Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Francisco Superior Court. Their case number is CGC-18-568990. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0971-12612248). Filed by Bristol-Myers Squibb Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gramacy, Ryan) (Filed on 8/21/2018) [Transferred from California Northern on 9/7/2018.] (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less