This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2017 at 02:29:40 (UTC).

Boone v. Wexford Health Sources Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/15/2017 Boone filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Wexford Health Sources Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Staci M. Yandle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:17-CV-00866

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Staci M. Yandle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael Boone

Vienna, IL 62995

Defendants

M. Swalls

Louis Shicker

Wexford Health Sources Inc

Arthur Funk

Caldwell

E Pearson

Mary Miller

Alphonso David

John Doe 1 - 22

 

Court Documents

10 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-02158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/15/2017)

#9

(#9) MERIT REVIEW OPINION - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/14/2017. See written Order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants E. Pearson and Mary Miller are dismissed. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Pearson and Miller. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants E. Pearson and Mary Miller are dismissed. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Pearson and Miller. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 08/14/2017)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) Telephone WRIT issued for 8/2/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Merit Review Hearing before Judge Harold Baker. Copy of writ faxed to institution and original placed in mail. (ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/17/2017)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Letter from Clerk of Court requesting trust fund ledgers for the past six months. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/11/2017)

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Michael Boone.(LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

2 #1

Notice Regarding Privacy Issues

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 211 19th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

1 #1

Envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Michael Boone. (LN, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2017: #1 Envelope) (KM, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case transferred in from District of Illinois Central; Case Number 2:17-cv-02158. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/15/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MERIT REVIEW OPINION - Entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on 8/14/2017. See written Order. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants E. Pearson and Mary Miller are dismissed. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Pearson and Miller. Plaintiff's claims against Defendants E. Pearson and Mary Miller are dismissed. The clerk is directed to terminate Defendants Pearson and Miller. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 08/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held on 8/2/2017 before Judge Harold A. Baker. Appearance by the Plaintiff Michael Boone by telephone. Merit Review Hearing held. Allegations of the complaint discussed. Written order to be entered. (Tape #UR-C: 10:03AM.) (JMB, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 08/02/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Telephone WRIT issued for 8/2/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Merit Review Hearing before Judge Harold Baker. Copy of writ faxed to institution and original placed in mail. (ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Harold A. Baker on July 17, 2017. A merit review hearing is set for August 2, 2017, at 10:00 a.m., by telephone conference call. The clerk is directed to issue the appropriate writ to insure plaintiffs appearance at this merit review hearing.(ED, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ORDER - Entered by Judge Sara Darrow on 7/14/2017 granting #3 Petition to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1915(b)(1), Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $15.05. The agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to forward the initial partial filing fee from Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. After payment of the initial partial filing fee (or immediately if no funds are available for that payment) the agency having custody of Plaintiff is directed to make monthly payments of 20 percent of the preceding month`s income credited to Plaintiff`s account to the Clerk of Court. Income includes all deposits from any source. The agency having custody of the plaintiff shall forward these payments each time Plaintiff`s account exceeds $10, until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff`s place of confinement, to the attention of the Trust Fund Office. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/14/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Letter from Clerk of Court requesting trust fund ledgers for the past six months. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/11/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) +++ PRISONER TRUST FUND LEDGER. (LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) PETITION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, filed by Michael Boone.(LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE OF CASE OPENING. Please be advised that your case has been assigned to Judge Sara Darrow. Effective immediately, all documents should be mailed or scanned to the Rock Island Division, 211 19th Street, Rock Island, IL 61201.Merit Review Deadline set for 7/31/2017. (Attachments: #1 Notice Regarding Privacy Issues)(LN, ilcd) [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against all defendants, filed by Michael Boone. (LN, ilcd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2017: #1 Envelope) (KM, ilcd). [Transferred from Illinois Central on 8/15/2017.] (Entered: 07/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less