This case was last updated from PACER on 09/16/2018 at 07:39:45 (UTC).

Booker v. Meritor, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/18/2018 Booker filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Meritor, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Mississippi Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Jane M. Virden, Sharion Aycock and Debra M. Brown. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    07/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Jane M. Virden

Presiding Judges

Sharion Aycock

Debra M. Brown

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Portia Booker

Defendants

Textron, Inc.

Rockwell Automation, Inc.

The Boeing Company

Meritor, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Marquette William Wolf

Attorney at TED B. LYON & ASSOCIATES, PC

18601 Lbj Freeway, Ste. 525

Mesquite, TX 75150

William Liston, III

Attorney at LISTON/LANCASTER

P O Box 14127

Jackson, MS 39236

Defendant Attorneys

Neil Charles Abramson

Attorney at LISKOW & LEWIS

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Carol Welborn Reisman

Attorney at LISKOW & LEWIS

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

William L. Smith

Attorney at BALCH & BINGHAM LLP

188 E. Capitol Street, Ste. 1400

Jackson, MS 39201

Nora Bolling Bilbro

Attorney at LISKOW & LEWIS

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Kelly Titus Scalise

Attorney at LISKOW & LEWIS

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras Street, Suite 5000

New Orleans, LA 70139

Phillip Samuel Sykes

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

Post Office Box 6010

Ridgeland, MS 39158-6010

Timothy J. Coughlin

Attorney at THOMPSON HINE LLP

3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114-1291

William J. Hubbard

Attorney at THOMPSON HINE LLP

3900 Key Center, 127 Public Square

Clleveland, OH 44114-1291

Lea Ann Smith

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 2700

New Orleans, LA 70170

Harold Barber Boone

Attorney at BUTLER SNOW LLP

1020 Highland Colony Parkway, Suite 1400

Ridgeland, MS 39157

 

Court Documents

31 #1

Addendum

#31

#30

#29

#28

#27

#26

#25

#24

#23

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

36 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#31) AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Motions due by 8/14/2019. See attached Addendum for amendments. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 9/14/2018. (Attachment: # 1 Addendum) (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#30) Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden: Telephonic Status Conference held on 9/10/2018. (irw) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#29) NOTICE of Conference: Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/10/2018 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. Plaintiffs' counsel must arrange and initiate the call to 662-390-4356. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#28) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Textron's Initial Disclosures by William L. Smith on behalf of Textron, Inc. to All Parties of Record. (Smith, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#27) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant The Boeing Company's Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of The Boeing Company to All Parties of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#26) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Rockwell Automation, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Rockwell Automation, Inc. to All Parties of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant Meritor, Inc.'s Initial Disclosures by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Meritor, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Harold Barber Boone on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., The Boeing Company (Boone, Harold)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiffs' Responses to Requests for Production and Interrogatories by Marquette William Wolf on behalf of Portia Booker to All Defendants. (Wolf, Marquette) Modified on 9/4/2018 (jla).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • TEXT ONLY ORDER granting #17 #18 #19 #20 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorneys Neil Charles Abramson, Kelly Titus Scalise, Carol Welborn Reisman, and Nora Bolling Bilbro are hereby admitted as counsel pro hac vice on behalf of Textron, Inc.. Counsel shall register with the Clerk as a user of the courts electronic filing system on or before September 5, 2018 at www.msnd.uscourts.gov/ecf. No further written order shall issue from the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/31/18. (bfg)(no document attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Meritor, Inc.. (Sykes, Phillip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Textron, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Textron, Inc.. (Smith, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 1/25/2019. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 8/30/2018. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 10/25/2018. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 11/27/2018. Motions due by 2/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden on 8/10/2018. (irw)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Master Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiffs and Master Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Phillip Samuel Sykes on behalf of Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Textron, Inc., The Boeing Company to All Counsel of Record. (Sykes, Phillip)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by William Liston, III on behalf of Portia Booker Meritor, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; Rockwell Automation, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; Textron, Inc. served on 7/30/2018; The Boeing Company served on 7/30/2018. (Liston, William)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Reissued as to Textron, Inc. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2018
  • Case Reassigned to District Judge Debra M. Brown. District Judge Sharion Aycock no longer assigned to the case. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Sharion Aycock and Magistrate Judge Jane M. Virden. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Meritor, Inc., Rockwell Automation, Inc., Textron, Inc., The Boeing Company. Emailed to attorney for service. (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0537-1575239, filed by Portia Booker. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jtm)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MERITOR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ROCKWELL AUTOMATION INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TEXTRON, INCORPORATED, d/b/a Lycoming Engines is a litigant

Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant