This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/10/2018 at 08:00:09 (UTC).

Booker v. Anderson et al

Case Summary

On 09/11/2018 Booker filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Anderson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Leigh Martin May. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-04297

  • Filing Date:

    09/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Leigh Martin May

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sharon Booker

Defendants

Samuel G. Woolwine

Tiffiny D. Anderson

Junior L. Stephens

Charles J. Lister

Edward Parks

Timothy J. Lattimore

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Keith Lionel Lindsay

Attorney at Edmond, Lindsay & Hoffler, LLP

344 Woodward Avenue, Se

Atlanta, GA 30312

William J.S. Atkins

Attorney at Edmond, Lindsay & Hoffler, LLP

344 Woodward Avenue, Se

Atlanta, GA 30312

Defendant Attorneys

Elizabeth Louise Fite

Attorney at DeKalb County Law Department

1300 Commerce Dr., 5Th Floor

Decatur, GA 30030

Aaron Joshua Ross

Attorney at DeKalb County Law Department

1300 Commerce Dr., 5Th Floor

Decatur, GA 30030

Taryn Courtney Haumann

Attorney at Dermer Appel Ruder, LLC -PT Ga

Suite 210, 6075 The Corners Parkway

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

Adam Lowell Appel

Attorney at Dermer Appel Ruder, LLC -PT Ga

Suite 210, 6075 The Corners Parkway

Peachtree Corners, GA 30092

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron Joshua Ross on behalf of Tiffiny D. Anderson, Timothy J. Lattimore, Charles J. Lister, Samuel G. Woolwine (Ross, Aaron) (Entered: 10/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) Defendant Timothy J. Lattimore's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Timothy J. Lattimore.(Fite, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) Defendant Tiffiny D. Anderson's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Tiffiny D. Anderson.(Fite, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Louise Fite on behalf of Tiffiny D. Anderson, Timothy J. Lattimore (Fite, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) Defendant Samuel G. Woolwine's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Samuel G. Woolwine.(Fite, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Louise Fite on behalf of Samuel G. Woolwine (Fite, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMENDED ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Charles J. Lister.(Fite, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. Text modified on 10/17/2018 (btql). (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) Defendant Charles J. Lister's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT and Affirmative Defenses by Charles J. Lister.(Fite, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Louise Fite on behalf of Charles J. Lister (Fite, Elizabeth) (Entered: 10/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) Defendant Parks' ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Edward Parks. Discovery ends on 3/4/2019.(Appel, Adam) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Return of Service Executed by Sharon Booker. Timothy J. Lattimore served on 9/26/2018, answer due 10/17/2018. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Return of Service Executed by Sharon Booker. Tiffiny D. Anderson served on 9/29/2018, answer due 10/22/2018. (Atkins, William) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Leigh Martin May on 9/13/18. (hfm) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Electronic Summons Issued as to Timothy J. Lattimore. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Electronic Summons Issued as to Tiffiny D. Anderson. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Electronic Summons Issued as to Samuel G. Woolwine. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Electronic Summons Issued as to Junior L. Stephens. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Edward Parks. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Charles J. Lister. (btql) (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Sharon Booker. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 113E-8138336) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 09/13/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Keith Lionel Lindsay