This case was last updated from PACER on 01/09/2018 at 02:26:29 (UTC).

Bone v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, et al

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 Bone filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is P. K. Holmes, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-06003

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

P. K. Holmes, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jason Bone

Defendants

Juan M. Fuentes

Progressive Insurance Company

American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania

National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

Navistar, Inc.

Rush Truck Centers of Virginia, Inc.

Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company

Estes Express Lanes

Truckmovers.com, Inc.

Truckmovers Depot, Inc.

Rush Truck Center

CNA Insurance Company

Rush Truck Centers

Estes Express Lines

Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Palmer Lambert

Attorney at Gainsburgh, Benjamin, David, Meunier & Warshauer

1100 Poydras St., Suite 2800

New Orleans, LA 70163-2800

Defendant Attorneys

Coleman Taylor Organ

Attorney at Organ and Associates

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

Sanem Ozdural

Attorney at AIG Staff Counsel

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

John Elliott Unsworth, III

Attorney at Law Offices of Sheryl Story (Metairie)

One Galleria Blvd., Suite 1500

Metairie, LA 70001-7508

Meredith Anne Mayberry

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130

James W. Hailey, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130

Shannon C. Burr

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 2000

New Orleans, LA 70130

James Vance King, III

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Laurie Lee DeArmond

Attorney at DeRouen Law Firm

650 Poydras St., Suite 2230

New Orleans, LA 70130

Patrick Dominic DeRouen

Attorney at DeRouen Law Firm

650 Poydras St., Suite 2230

New Orleans, LA 70130

A. Spencer Gulden

Attorney at Organ & Associates

909 Poydras Street, Suite 3000

New Orleans, LA 70112

 

Court Documents

#1

(#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **For future filings, parties should not be entered into the record in ALL CAPS. Clerk corrected party names. No further action necessary.** (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)

1 #8

Summons for Estes Express Lanes

1 #2

Summons for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA

1 #3

Summons for Truckmovers Depot, Inc.

1 #5

Summons for Navistar, Inc.

1 #4

Summons for Truckmovers.com, Inc.

1 #7

Summons for Rush Truck Center

1 #6

Summons for Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc. d/b/a Truckmovers

1 #9

Summons for Juan M. Fentes

#83

(#83) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Parties. (hnc) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

82 #1

*Restricted*

#82

(#82) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern-Do not use if MDL case - see SDSD list; Case Number 2:17-cv-05017. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2018)

#35

(#81) Case transferred to District of Western District of Arkansas: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc.'s #35 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer is GRANTED to the extent that the motion requests the transfer of Plaintiff's action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bone v. Navistar, Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 17-5017, is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/5/2018.(mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

35 #3

Proposed Order

35 #1

Memorandum in Support

#81

(#81) Case transferred to District of Western District of Arkansas: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc.'s #35 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer is GRANTED to the extent that the motion requests the transfer of Plaintiff's action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bone v. Navistar, Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 17-5017, is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/5/2018.(mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

35 #2

Notice of Submission (Civil Only)

#79

(#79) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jason Bone, Truckmovers.com, Inc., Truckmovers Depot, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Juan M. Fuentes, Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., Estes Express Lines, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text/filers on 1/3/2018 (mmv). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)

157 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#83) Magistrate Notice/Consent Furnished to Parties. (hnc) (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#82) Case transferred in from District of Louisiana Eastern-Do not use if MDL case - see SDSD list; Case Number 2:17-cv-05017. Docket sheet received. (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#81) Case transferred to District of Western District of Arkansas: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc.'s #35 Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer is GRANTED to the extent that the motion requests the transfer of Plaintiff's action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Bone v. Navistar, Inc., et al., Civil Action No. 17-5017, is transferred to the United States District Court for the Western District of Arkansas. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 1/5/2018.(mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#80) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #79 Status Report. **Filing attorney did not enter additional filer(s) in the blank text box on the docket text screen. Clerk added filer(s).** (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#79) JOINT STATUS REPORT by Jason Bone, Truckmovers.com, Inc., Truckmovers Depot, Inc., Navistar, Inc., Juan M. Fuentes, Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc., American Casualty Company of Reading, Pennsylvania, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA., Estes Express Lines, Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company (Lambert, Matthew) Modified text/filers on 1/3/2018 (mmv). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 01/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#78) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #77 Answer to Amended Complaint. **Document should have also been linked to another document by checking the box 'Should the document you are filing link to another document' or by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by also linking document to document 20.** (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 12/26/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#77) ANSWER to #20 Amended Complaint, #62 Second Amended Complaint by Progressive Paloverde Insurance Company.(DeRouen, Patrick) Modified text/linkage on 12/26/2017 (mmv). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 12/22/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#76) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jason Bone re #56 MOTION Dismiss for Improper Venue or in the alternative, MOTION to Transfer by Navistar, Inc. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#75) RESPONSE/MEMORANDUM in Opposition filed by Jason Bone re #54 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or in the Alternative, MOTION to Change Venue.(jls) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#74) ORDER GRANTING #73 Motion for Leave to File Memorandum in Opposition to Motions to Dismiss for Improper Venue, or, In the Alternative, Motion to Transfer filed by Defendants, Truckmovers Depot, Inc., Truckmovers.com, Inc., and Navistar, Inc. Signed by Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/4/2017. (jls) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 12/05/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
63 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed; National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 5/19/2017, answer due 6/9/2017. (Lambert, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Progressive Insurance Company served on 5/26/2017, answer due 6/16/2017. (Lambert, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Truckmovers Depot, Inc. served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Lambert, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed; Truckmovers.com, Inc. served on 5/22/2017, answer due 6/12/2017. (Lambert, Matthew) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan A. Ennis of Complaint and Summons served on Truckaway System, Inc. on No Date. (Lambert, Matthew) Modified event/text/answer due date on 6/2/2017 (jls). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service by Magan A. Ennis of Complaint and Summons served on CNA Insurance Company on No Date .(Lambert, Matthew) Modified event/text/answer due date on 6/2/2017 (jls). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 06/01/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to CNA Insurance Company, Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc., Estes Express Lanes, Juan M. Fuentes, National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, Navistar, Inc., Progressive Insurance Company, Rush Truck Center, TruckMovers Depot, Inc., TruckMovers.com, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons)(mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Complaint. **For future filings, parties should not be entered into the record in ALL CAPS. Clerk corrected party names. No further action necessary.** (mmv) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown and Magistrate Judge Michael North. (djg) [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 05/18/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with jury demand against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-6154913) filed by Jason Bone. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA, #3 Summons for Truckmovers Depot, Inc., #4 Summons for Truckmovers.com, Inc., #5 Summons for Navistar, Inc., #6 Summons for Dealer's Choice Truckaway System, Inc., #7 Summons for Rush Truck Center, #8 Summons for Estes Express Lanes, #9 Summons for Juan M. Fentes, #10 Summons for CNA Insurance Company, #11 Summons for Progressive Insurance Company)Attorney Matthew Palmer Lambert added to party Jason Bone(pty:pla).(Lambert, Matthew) Modified text on 5/18/2017 (mmv). [Transferred from laed on 1/8/2018.] (Entered: 05/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.