This case was last updated from PACER on 11/20/2018 at 07:48:42 (UTC).

Bond v. Plastic Container Corp.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 Bond filed a Labor - Family & Medical Leave lawsuit against Plastic Container Corp. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Tennessee Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are S. Thomas Anderson and Edward G. Bryant. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02650

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Family & Medical Leave

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Tennessee Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

S. Thomas Anderson

Referral Judge

Edward G. Bryant

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kevin Bond

Defendant

Plastic Container Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan L. Bobbitt

Attorney at GILBERT MCWHERTER SCOTT BOBBTT PLC

341 Cool Springs Blvd., Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Caraline Elizabeth Rickard

Attorney at GILBERT RUSSELL MCWHERTER SCOTT & BOBBITT PLC

341 Cool Springs Blvd, Suite 230

Franklin, TN 37067

Defendant Attorney

Lorna K Geiler

Attorney at Meyer Capel, A Professional Corporation

306 W. Church St.

Champaign, IL 61820

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Settlement by Kevin Bond (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#11

(#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/30/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/16/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2902491) by Plastic Container Corp.. (Geiler, Lorna) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Caraline Elizabeth Rickard on behalf of Kevin Bond (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

7 #2

Exhibit Returned Receipt

7 #1

Exhibit Affidavit of Service

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Bond as to Plastic Container Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Returned Receipt)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to Plastic Container Corp.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

2 #1

Judicial Cards

#2

(#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Judicial Cards) (cdi). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Plastic Container Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2885561), filed by Kevin Bond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Settlement by Kevin Bond (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/30/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER GRANTING #9 MOTION FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson on 10/16/18. (mbm) (Entered: 10/16/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number ATNWDC-2902491) by Plastic Container Corp.. (Geiler, Lorna) (Entered: 10/15/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Caraline Elizabeth Rickard on behalf of Kevin Bond (Rickard, Caraline) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kevin Bond as to Plastic Container Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service, #2 Exhibit Returned Receipt)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 10/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • NOTE TO ALL PARTIES:This case was incorrectly opened in the Western Division of the Western District. It was transferred to the Jackson office and the case number has been modified. Please take notice of the case number, as the only change in the number will be the divisional code at the beginning of the case number. (Ex:1:XX-cv-XXXX or 2:XX-XXXX). The old case has been closed and will contain a case flag that it is closed. Particular attention should be used when selecting the case number during CM/ECF filing of future pleadings to ensure that you are filing in the correct (open) case. The new case number is 1:18-cv-2650 STA egb. Please list the correct case number on all future pleadings. (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to Plastic Container Corp.. The filer has been notified electronically that the summons has been issued, and the new docket entry reflects this. Upon notification of the new docket entry, the filer is to print the issued summons in order to effect service. (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (#5) NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (#4) NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • (#3) NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jld) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Chief Judge S. Thomas Anderson and Magistrate Judge Edward G. Bryant added. (jld) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/21/2018: #1 Judicial Cards) (cdi). (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Plastic Container Corp. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ATNWDC-2885561), filed by Kevin Bond. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bobbitt, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less