This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Boles v. Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 09/19/2018 Boles filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly E. West and Ronald A. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:18-CV-00320

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oklahoma Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kimberly E. West

Ronald A. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Matthew A. Boles

Defendant

Social Security Administration

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David K. Harp

Po Box 998

Fort Smith, AR 72902-0998

Defendant Attorney

Cheryl R. Triplett

Attorney at US Attorney (OKED)

520 Denison Ave

Muskogee, OK 74401

 

Court Documents

#6

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/26/2018)(nm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/19/2018: main document attached (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

#5

RESTRICTED

#8

(#8) CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition of Case by Judge Ronald A. White Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-320-KEW (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CONSENT to Magistrate Judge Disposition of Case by Judge Ronald A. White Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV-18-320-KEW (acg, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC SERVICE of Complaint by Matthew A. Boles (Harp, David) Modified on 9/26/2018 to edit event and text (dma, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration by serving Regional Counsel (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Issued by Court Clerk as to Social Security Administration by serving U.S. Attorney (pjw, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • (#4) MINUTE ORDER by Judge Ronald A. White referring case to Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West for all further proceedings in accordance with jurisdiction pursuant to 28 USC 636. All future filings shall bear the case number 18-CV-320-RAW-KEW. (nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • FILING FEES Paid in Full on 9/19/2018 in the amount of $400, receipt number 1086-1208105 (Re: #2 Social Security Complaint ) by Matthew A. Boles (Harp, David) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk directing Plaintiff to pay the filing fee of $400 within 7 days or file a Motion for Informa Pauperis. Plaintiff's failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. NOTE: The court cannot issue summons until the filing fee is paid. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the court's PDF version and email it to CM-ECFIntake_OKED@oked.uscourts.gov. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 9/26/2018)(nm, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 9/19/2018: main document attached (nm, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration by Matthew A. Boles (With attachments)(nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) CIVIL COVER SHEET by Matthew A. Boles (nm, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.