This case was last updated from PACER on 12/10/2018 at 10:05:15 (UTC).

Bogan v. Chisholm et al

Case Summary

On 07/16/2018 Bogan filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Chisholm. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Wisconsin Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William E Duffin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-01091

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Wisconsin Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William E Duffin

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Antwan Bogan

Defendants

Michael C Schindhelm

Virginia Stuller

John T Chisholm

Milwaukee County District Attorney's Office

Christopher T Dee

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

Wisconsin Dept of Justice - 1983 Actions

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(blr) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

10 #1

Envelope with New Address and Prisoner Number

#1

(#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against John T Chisholm, Michael C Schindhelm, Virginia Stuller by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

14 #1

Envelope

#13

RESTRICTED

5 #1

Cover Letter

#10

(#10) MOTION to Dismiss all claims against Circuit Court Judge T Christopher Dee in his official capacity by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope with New Address and Prisoner Number - Plaintiff now at Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by John T Chisholm, Michael C Schindhelm, Virginia Stuller. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#9

(#9) SUPPLEMENT by Antwan Bogan re #5 Amended Complaint. (mlm) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

#7

RESTRICTED

#4

(#4) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form and six-month trust account statement be filed by August 7, 2018. (mlm)

#12

(#12) ORDER that on or before 8/24/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 6.68 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/3/2018. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Milwaukee County Sheriff for Milw County Jail)(lz)

#8

(#8) LETTER from Antwan Bogan to the Clerk's office re: difficulty in getting trust account statements from other facilities. (mlm) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

#3

(#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

#14

(#14) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss case by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2018
  • Case Terminated. (ECF receipt sent to Antwan Bogan via USPS) (mlm) (Entered: 08/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MOTION to Voluntarily Dismiss case by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DISREGARD - FILED IN INCORRECT CASE Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan from case no 18-cv-1091. (lz) Modified on 8/6/2018 (lz). (Entered: 08/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER that on or before 8/24/2018 plaintiff shall forward to the Clerk of Court the sum of $ 6.68 as an initial partial filing fee in this action signed by Magistrate Judge William E Duffin on 8/3/2018. (cc: all counsel - via US Mail to Plaintiff and Milwaukee County Sheriff for Milw County Jail)(lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Additional Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss all claims against Circuit Court Judge T Christopher Dee in his official capacity by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Envelope with New Address and Prisoner Number - Plaintiff now at Milwaukee County Jail)(lz)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT by Antwan Bogan re #5 Amended Complaint. (mlm) (Entered: 07/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) LETTER from Antwan Bogan to the Clerk's office re: difficulty in getting trust account statements from other facilities. (mlm) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 07/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Antwan Bogan. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (mlm) (Entered: 07/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Antwan Bogan. (Attachments: #1 Cover Letter)(blr) (Entered: 07/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) LETTER from the clerk to plaintiff re Consent/Refusal to Magistrate Judge William E. Duffin and requesting that the consent/refusal form and six-month trust account statement be filed by August 7, 2018. (mlm)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed Without Prepayment of the Filing Fee by John T Chisholm, Michael C Schindhelm, Virginia Stuller. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PRISONER COMPLAINT against John T Chisholm, Michael C Schindhelm, Virginia Stuller by Antwan Bogan. (mlm) (Entered: 07/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.