This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/22/2018 at 07:23:54 (UTC).

Boateng v. Aurora Police Department et al

Case Summary

On 10/23/2018 Boateng filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Aurora Police Department. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judges overseeing this case are William J. Martinez and S. Kato Crews. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02694

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William J. Martinez

Referral Judge

S. Kato Crews

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Philip Boateng

Defendants

Aurora Police Department

Jeffery (I) Longnecker

City of Aurora

Nicholas (I) Metz

Nicholas Metz

Jeffrey Longnecker

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kristina M. Bergsten

Attorney at Bergsten Law Offices

700 17Th Street, Suite 1300

Denver, CO 80202

Defendant Attorneys

Isabelle Sabra Evans

Attorney at Aurora City Attorney's Office

15151 East Alameda Parkway, 5Th Floor

Aurora, CO 80012

Peter Ruben Morales

Attorney at Aurora City Attorney's Office

15151 East Alameda Parkway, 5Th Floor

Aurora, CO 80012

Jordan Cary Lubeck

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 900, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

Jonathan Marshall Abramson

Attorney at Kissinger & Fellman, P.C.

3773 Cherry Creek North Drive, Suite 900, Ptarmigan Place

Denver, CO 80209

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Nicholas Metz, City of Aurora, Nicholas (I) Metz, Jeffery (I) Longnecker, Aurora Police Department, Jeffrey Longnecker. All Defendants. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Cary Lubeck on behalf of Jeffery (I) LongneckerAttorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party Jeffery (I) Longnecker(pty:dft) (Lubeck, Jordan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Marshall Abramson on behalf of Jeffery (I) LongneckerAttorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party Jeffery (I) Longnecker(pty:dft) (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

#12

(#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabelle Sabra Evans on behalf of Aurora Police Department, City of Aurora, Jeffrey Longnecker, Nicholas MetzAttorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Aurora Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Jeffrey Longnecker(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Nicholas Metz(pty:dft) (Evans, Isabelle) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of Aurora Police Department, City of Aurora, Jeffrey Longnecker, Nicholas MetzAttorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Aurora Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Jeffrey Longnecker(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Nicholas Metz(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

#10

(#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/13/18. (amont, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Nicholas Metz waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. City of Aurora waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Aurora Police Department waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Jeffrey Longnecker waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

3 #4

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

3 #3

Summons

3 #2

Summons

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

1 #5

Summons metz

1 #2

Summons longnecker

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendants Nicholas Metz, City of Aurora, Nicholas (I) Metz, Jeffery (I) Longnecker, Aurora Police Department, Jeffrey Longnecker. All Defendants. (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan Cary Lubeck on behalf of Jeffery (I) LongneckerAttorney Jordan Cary Lubeck added to party Jeffery (I) Longnecker(pty:dft) (Lubeck, Jordan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan Marshall Abramson on behalf of Jeffery (I) LongneckerAttorney Jonathan Marshall Abramson added to party Jeffery (I) Longnecker(pty:dft) (Abramson, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Isabelle Sabra Evans on behalf of Aurora Police Department, City of Aurora, Jeffrey Longnecker, Nicholas MetzAttorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Aurora Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Jeffrey Longnecker(pty:dft), Attorney Isabelle Sabra Evans added to party Nicholas Metz(pty:dft) (Evans, Isabelle) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Peter Ruben Morales on behalf of Aurora Police Department, City of Aurora, Jeffrey Longnecker, Nicholas MetzAttorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Aurora Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Jeffrey Longnecker(pty:dft), Attorney Peter Ruben Morales added to party Nicholas Metz(pty:dft) (Morales, Peter) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Scheduling Conference set for 1/24/2019 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 11/13/18. (amont, ) (Entered: 11/13/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Nicholas Metz waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. City of Aurora waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Aurora Police Department waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Philip Boateng. Jeffrey Longnecker waiver sent on 10/27/2018, answer due 12/26/2018. (Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#5) ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2017 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10 /24/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • (#4) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 10/24/2018. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, ) (Entered: 10/24/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Aurora Police Department, City of Aurora, Jeffrey Longnecker, Nicholas Metz (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6358925)Attorney Kristina M. Bergsten added to party Philip Boateng(pty:pla), filed by Philip Boateng. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons longnecker, #3 Summons aurora pd, #4 Summons city, #5 Summons metz)(Bergsten, Kristina) (Entered: 10/23/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less