This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2018 at 07:11:27 (UTC).

Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund v. American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.

Case Summary

On 08/24/2018 Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Walter and Steve Kim. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:18-CV-07449

  • Filing Date:

    08/24/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John F. Walter

Referral Judge

Steve Kim

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund

Defendants

American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc., a California corporation

American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason J Kennedy

Attorney at Kennedy Law Firm

3444 Camino Del Rio North, Suite 106

San Diego, CA 92108

Defendant Attorneys

Carrie E Bushman

Attorney at Cook Brown

2407 J Street 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95816

Ronald W Brown

Attorney at Cook Brown LLP

2407 J Street 2Nd Floor

Sacramento, CA 95816

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties identifying Albert Weinstein. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc..(Attorney Carrie E Bushman added to party American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

#13

(#13) DECLARATION of Carrie E. Bushman re Compliance with General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

#18

(#18) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. Court Trial set for 8/27/2019 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#8

(#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

#15

(#15) DECLARATION of Jason J. Kennedy re Compliance with General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

#17

(#17) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on October 22, 2018 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 1, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 5, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

#4

(#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund, (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#16

(#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund.. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

#14

(#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund, upon Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc. served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc., a California corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#12

(#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 22, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 12, 2018. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22312859 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Attorney Jason J Kennedy added to party Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla))(Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#11

(#11) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties identifying Bardia Nahidi. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. The purpose of this Order is to notify the parties and their counsel of the deadlines and the schedule that will govern this action. Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM. Court Trial set for 8/27/2019 at 8:30 AM. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER VACATING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REFERRAL TO PRIVATE MEDIATION by Judge John F. Walter. The Court has reviewed the parties' Joint Rule 26(f) Report and finds that a Scheduling Conference is not necessary. The hearing on October 22, 2018 is vacated and taken off calendar. A Scheduling and Case Management Order will issue. Any unserved DOE defendants are dismissed at this time. The Court, having considered the parties' Request: ADR Procedure Selection, the Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program, or the report submitted by the parties pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(f) and Civil L.R. 26-1, hereby: ORDERS this case referred to: ADR PROCEDURE NO. 3: (Private mediation). The ADR proceeding is to be completed no later than: April 1, 2019. The Joint Report re: Results of Settlement Conference due on: April 5, 2019. (iv) (Entered: 10/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 4 days, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund.. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 10/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) DECLARATION of Jason J. Kennedy re Compliance with General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 09/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund, upon Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc. served on 9/10/2018, answer due 10/1/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc., a California corporation in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 09/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) DECLARATION of Carrie E. Bushman re Compliance with General Order Authorizing Electronic Filing filed by Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/25/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge John F. Walter: Counsel are hereby notified that a Scheduling Conference has been set for October 22, 2018 at 1:15 p.m. before Judge John F. Walter in Courtroom 7A, 350 W. 1st St, Los CA 90012. Lead Trial Counsel shall attend all proceedings before this Court, including the Scheduling Conference. Counsel are directed to comply with Rule 26 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 26-1 in a timely fashion and to file a Joint Report, on or before October 12, 2018. (iv) (Entered: 09/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties identifying Bardia Nahidi. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Notice and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties identifying Albert Weinstein. (Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc..(Attorney Carrie E Bushman added to party American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.(pty:dft))(Bushman, Carrie) (Entered: 09/17/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant American Tile and Brick Veneer, Inc.. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (lh) (Entered: 08/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund, (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22312859 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund. (Attorney Jason J Kennedy added to party Board of Trustees of the Tile Industry Health and Welfare Fund(pty:pla))(Kennedy, Jason) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.