This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/06/2019 at 08:06:45 (UTC).

Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools v. Native American Disability Law Center, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2018 Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools filed a Civil Right - Education Discrimination lawsuit against Native American Disability Law Center, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Mexico District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven C. Yarbrough and Karen B. Molzen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-01039

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Education Discrimination

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Steven C. Yarbrough

Presiding Judge

Karen B. Molzen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools

Defendants

Native American Disability Law Center, Inc.

Mavis Yazzie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katharine C Downey

Attorney at Adams+Crow Law Firm

5051 Journal Center Ne, Suite 320

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Alana M. De Young

Attorney at Adams+Crow, P.C.

5051 Journal Center Blvd. Ne, #320

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Samantha Adams

Attorney at AdamsCrow Law Firm

5051 Journal Center Blvd, Suite 320

Albuquerque, NM 87109

Defendant Attorney

Maureen A Sanders

Attorney at Sanders & Westbrook, PC

102 Granite, Nw

Albuquerque, NM 87102-2310

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

#10

#9

1 #15

Exhibit O

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #11

Exhibit K

1 #10

Exhibit J

1 #9

Exhibit I

1 #8

Exhibit H

1 #7

Exhibit G

1 #5

Exhibit E

1 #4

Exhibit D

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools. (Adams, Samantha) (Entered: 01/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools re #9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM of Rule 7.4 Extension to Respond to Motion to Dismiss (Adams, Samantha) (Entered: 12/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough Finding Good Cause To Delay Scheduling Order. (kc) (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Native American Disability Law Center, Inc.. (Sanders, Maureen) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF RULE 73 CONSENT Received by All Parties. Related documents: 7 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Native American Disability Law Center, Inc., Mavis Yazzie, 6 Consent to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge, filed by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools. [THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (jg) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Docket(#7) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Native American Disability Law Center, Inc., Mavis Yazzie voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Sanders, Maureen)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT TO PROCEED Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. Under 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 73(b), Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools voluntarily consent(s) to have United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial, and order the entry of final judgment. (Adams, Samantha)[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, Acknowledgement filed by Native American Disability Law Center, Inc., Mavis Yazzie. (Sanders, Maureen) (Entered: 11/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling and Administrative Fees Received: $ 400 receipt number 1084-6124760 re #1 Complaint, filed by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools (Payment made via Pay.gov)(Adams, Samantha) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (ln) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools re #1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Adams, Samantha) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • Docket(#2) PLEASE TAKE NOTICE that this case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen to conduct dispositive proceedings in this matter, including motions and trial. Appeal from a judgment entered by a Magistrate Judge will be to the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit. It is the responsibility of the case filer to serve a copy of this Notice upon all parties with the summons and complaint. Consent is strictly voluntary, and a party is free to withhold consent without adverse consequences. Should a party choose to consent, notice should be made no later than 21 days after entry of the Order setting the Rule 16 Initial Scheduling Conference. For e-filers, visit our Web site at www.nmd.uscourts.gov for more information and instructions.[THIS IS A TEXT-ONLY ENTRY. THERE ARE NO DOCUMENTS ATTACHED.] (ln) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2018
  • DocketUnited States Magistrate Judge Karen B. Molzen and United States Magistrate Judge Steven C. Yarbrough assigned. (ln) (Entered: 11/08/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Petition for Attorneys' Fees and Costs to Prevailing Party against All Defendants ( Filing Fee - Online Payment), filed by Board of Education of Gallup-McKinley County Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Adams, Samantha) (Entered: 11/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Native American Disability Law Center is a litigant

Latest cases where Board of Education of Baltimore County d/b/a Baltimore County Public Schools is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samantha Adams