This case was last updated from PACER on 09/17/2018 at 07:59:38 (UTC).

Blum v. Schmitt

Case Summary

On 07/19/2018 Blum filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Schmitt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Patricia L. Cohen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:18-CV-01203

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Patricia L. Cohen

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Roger Blum

Farmington, MO 63640

Respondent

David Schmitt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Stephen D. Hawke

Attorney at ATTORNEY GENERAL OF MISSOURI

P.O. Box 899

Jefferson City, MO 65102-0899

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 5, 2018. (MCB) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

#10

(#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. (See Case Management Order for complete details.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 5, 2018. (MCB) (Magistrate Jurisdiction form sent along with Doc. 9 and 10 on 9/5/2018 (MCB). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

8 #1

letter and envelope

#8

(#8) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Roger Blum. (Attachments: #1 letter and envelope)(CBL) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

7 #1

Envelope

#7

(#7) Letter to Court from Petitioner re: Motion to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CLO) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#6

(#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send petitioner a 2254 form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, petitioner must fill out the 2254 form and return it to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings. (cc: sent Roger Blum a 2254 form.) Response to Court due by 9/4/2018.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/14/2018. (AAS) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

#4

(#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Roger Blum. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

#3

RESTRICTED

1 #5

Correspondence

1 #4

Judge Assignment Label

1 #3

Envelope

1 #2

Original Filing Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Document construed as, "" PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Roger Blum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope, #4 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2018: #5 Correspondence) (DLB). (Entered: 07/20/2018)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2018
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9, 10. sent to non-electronic party this date Wed Sep 5 16:27:32 CDT 2018 (Berg, Melanie) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 4. (See Case Management Order for complete details.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following provisions apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances: This case has been randomly assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge. The parties have twenty-one (21) days from their entry of appearance to file their Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction forms. Respondent must show cause, in writing and within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order, why the relief requested in the instant petition should not be granted. Show Cause Response due by 10/20/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 5, 2018. (MCB) (Magistrate Jurisdiction form sent along with Doc. 9 and 10 on 9/5/2018 (MCB). (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED petitioner's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [Doc. #2] is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on September 5, 2018. (MCB) (Entered: 09/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) AMENDED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Roger Blum. (Attachments: #1 letter and envelope)(CBL) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter to Court from Petitioner re: Motion to Appoint Counsel (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (CLO) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Tue Aug 14 10:21:31 CDT 2018 (Shepard, Alicia) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk is directed to send petitioner a 2254 form. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order, petitioner must fill out the 2254 form and return it to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if petitioner fails to comply with this Order, the Court may dismiss this action without further proceedings. (cc: sent Roger Blum a 2254 form.) Response to Court due by 9/4/2018.. Signed by District Judge Jean C. Hamilton on 08/14/2018. (AAS) (Entered: 08/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • (#5) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Fri Jul 20 16:04:08 CDT 2018 (admin,) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • Case Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2018
  • ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Petitioner Roger Blum. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Certified Inmate Account Statement by Petitioner Roger Blum. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis HABEAS CASES by Petitioner Roger Blum. (DLB) (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Document construed as, "" PETITION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Roger Blum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Envelope, #4 Judge Assignment Label)(DLB) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/20/2018: #5 Correspondence) (DLB). (Entered: 07/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less