This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/07/2018 at 07:03:35 (UTC).

Blue Spike, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Blue Spike, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-03392

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Blue Spike, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Randall T Garteiser

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan Michael Fisch

Desmond Jui

Melissa Richards Smith

Jeffrey M Saltman

Kathleen Ryland

Roy William Sigler

Ken K. Fung

 

Court Documents

103 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#103

#102

#101

#100

#99

#98

#96

95 #1

*Restricted*

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

260 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • Docket(#104) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#103) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Patent Rule 2-1 regarding Notice of Pendency of Other Action involving Same Patent. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#102) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#101) NOTICE of Relate Case by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Re-filed) (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified text on 6/27/2018, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#100) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juniper Networks, Inc... (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***NOTICE by Juniper Networks, Inc. of Related Cases (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/26/2018 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Ken K. Fung for Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • Docket(#97) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING Case Management Conference to 8/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:17-cv-00016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Juniper Networks, Inc. to 4/13/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Juniper Networks, Inc..( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Spike, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/09/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc. Summons emailed to Plaintiff for service. (rlf) Modified on 2/17/2017 (rlf). (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketJudge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6100195.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/06/2017)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less