This case was last updated from PACER on 08/07/2018 at 07:03:35 (UTC).

Blue Spike, LLC v. Juniper Networks, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/08/2018 Blue Spike, LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against Juniper Networks, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nathanael M. Cousins and Beth Labson Freeman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:18-CV-03392

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Nathanael M. Cousins

Presiding Judge

Beth Labson Freeman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Blue Spike, LLC

Defendant and Counter Claimant

Juniper Networks, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

Randall T Garteiser

Attorney at Garteiser Honea PLLC

218 N. College Ave

Tyler, TX 75702

Defendant and Counter Claimant Attorneys

Alan Michael Fisch

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Desmond Jui

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - San Jose

96 North Third Street, Suite 260

San Jose, CA 95112

Melissa Richards Smith

Attorney at Gillam & Smith, LLP

303 South Washington Avenue

Marshall, TX 75670

Jeffrey M Saltman

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Kathleen Ryland

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP - DC

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Roy William Sigler

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

5301 Wisconsin Avenue Nw, Fourth Floor

Washington, DC 20015

Ken K. Fung

Attorney at Fisch Sigler LLP

1250 Oakmead Parkway, Ste 210, Sunnyvale

Sunnyvale, CA 94085

 

Court Documents

103 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#103

(#103) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Patent Rule 2-1 regarding Notice of Pendency of Other Action involving Same Patent. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

#102

(#102) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

#101

(#101) NOTICE of Relate Case by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Re-filed) (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified text on 6/27/2018, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2018)

#100

(#100) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juniper Networks, Inc... (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#99

(#99) ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***NOTICE by Juniper Networks, Inc. of Related Cases (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/26/2018 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2018)

#98

(#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Ken K. Fung for Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

#96

(#96) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

95 #1

*Restricted*

1 #15

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #14

Exhibit N

1 #13

Exhibit M

1 #12

Exhibit L

1 #6

Exhibit F

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6100195.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/06/2017)

260 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2018
  • (#104) CLERK'S NOTICE RESETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AFTER REASSIGNMENT. Case Management Statement due by 11/8/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 11/15/2018 11:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 3, 5th Floor. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tshS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2018) (Entered: 07/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#103) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Beth Labson Freeman for all further proceedings pursuant to Local Patent Rule 2-1 regarding Notice of Pendency of Other Action involving Same Patent. This case is assigned to a judge who participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins remains as referral judge assigned to case. Reassignment Order signed by Executive Committee on 7/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/11/2018) (Entered: 07/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#102) NOTICE of Pendency of Other Action Involving Same Patent by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 7/10/2018) (Entered: 07/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#101) NOTICE of Relate Case by Juniper Networks, Inc. (Re-filed) (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/27/2018) Modified text on 6/27/2018, (to conform with document posted by counsel.) (cv, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#100) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Juniper Networks, Inc... (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#99) ***FILED IN ERROR - DISREGARD***NOTICE by Juniper Networks, Inc. of Related Cases (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/22/2018) Modified on 6/26/2018 (sp, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 06/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#98) NOTICE of Appearance by Ken K. Fung for Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fung, Ken) (Filed on 6/20/2018) (Entered: 06/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • (#97) CLERK'S NOTICE ADVANCING Case Management Conference to 8/8/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 8/1/2018. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#96) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 9/5/2018. Initial Case Management Conference set for 9/12/2018 10:00 AM in San Jose, Courtroom 5, 4th Floor. (dhmS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2018) (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#95) Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern; Case Number 6:17-cv-00016. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
88 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Juniper Networks, Inc. to 4/13/2017. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( mjc, ) (Entered: 03/13/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Juniper Networks, Inc..( Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alan Michael Fisch on behalf of Juniper Networks, Inc. (Fisch, Alan) (Entered: 03/10/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Blue Spike, LLC. Juniper Networks, Inc. served on 2/17/2017, answer due 3/10/2017. (mjc, ) (Entered: 03/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Juniper Networks, Inc. Summons emailed to Plaintiff for service. (rlf) Modified on 2/17/2017 (rlf). (Entered: 02/17/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/12/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • Judge Robert W. Schroeder, III and Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell added. (mll, ) (Entered: 01/09/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Juniper Networks, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-6100195.), filed by Blue Spike, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Garteiser, Randall) (Entered: 01/06/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Juniper Networks, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Blue Spike, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey M Saltman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Michael Fisch