This case was last updated from PACER on 12/03/2018 at 07:17:36 (UTC).

Blank v. Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 10/04/2018 Blank filed a Finance - Banking lawsuit against Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-CV-02320

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Banking

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Ohio Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Lois M Blank

Lois Blank

Defendants

Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.

U.S. Bank National Association, as Trustee, successor in interest to Bank of America, National Association as Trustee as successor by merger to LaSalle Bank, National Association as Trustee for WaMu M

U.S. Bank National Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Bruce M. Broyles

Attorney at Ste. L

2670 North Columbus Street

Lancaster, OH 43130

Defendant Attorneys

David A. Wallace

Attorney at Carpenter, Lipps & Leland - Columbus

280 North High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

Karen M. Cadieux

Attorney at Carpenter, Lipps & Leland - Columbus

280 North High Street

Columbus, OH 43215

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Letter to Ashtabula County Court

9 #1

Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout

#4

(#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Cadieux, Karen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

9 #2

Exhibit B, Auditor's Map

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#6

(#6) State court documents received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas case number 2018 cv 572. Original record returned to Ashtabula County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Ashtabula County Court) (S,L) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Cadieux, Karen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#2

(#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

#10

(#10) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/19/2018. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

#9

(#9) Motion to dismiss count filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout, #2 Exhibit B, Auditor's Map)(Wallace, David) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

#8

(#8) Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Lois Blank. (Broyles, Bruce) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

#7

(#7) Acknowledgement of receipt received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #6 . (S,SR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

#11

(#11) Motion to attend by telephone filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #10 . (Wallace, David) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

#5

(#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout)(Wallace, David) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

1 #2

Errata B, State Court Summons and Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/30/2018
  • IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] of with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2018 at 09:30 AM. Note that this change is in start time only. (W,CM) (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Order [non-document] granting Defendants' #11 Motion to excuse personal attendance of party representative at the December 10, 2018 Case Management Conference. Defendants' party representative must participate by phone. Defendants should consider the amount saved by attending telephonically when making a settlement offer. Entered on behalf of Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/21/2018.(K,K) (Entered: 11/21/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Motion to attend by telephone filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #10 . (Wallace, David) (Entered: 11/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Case Management Conference Scheduling Order with case management conference to be held on 12/10/2018 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 18B before Judge Dan Aaron Polster. Report of Parties' Planning Meeting due no later than 12:00 p.m. on 12/6/2018. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster on 11/19/2018. (K,K) (Entered: 11/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Motion to dismiss count filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #8 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout, #2 Exhibit B, Auditor's Map)(Wallace, David) (Entered: 11/14/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Amended complaint against All Defendants. Filed by Lois Blank. (Broyles, Bruce) (Entered: 10/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Acknowledgement of receipt received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas. Related document(s) #6 . (S,SR) (Entered: 10/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) State court documents received from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas case number 2018 cv 572. Original record returned to Ashtabula County Court with acknowledgement of receipt enclosed. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Ashtabula County Court) (S,L) (Entered: 10/22/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim with Memorandum in Support filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc., U.S. Bank National Association. Related document(s) #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Auditor's Printout)(Wallace, David) (Entered: 10/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Cadieux, Karen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Select Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Cadieux, Karen) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Notice by Clerk that U.S. Bank National Association and Select Portfolio Servicing Inc. failed to file a corporate disclosure statement as required by Local Rule 3.13(b). (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Magistrate Consent Form issued. (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2018
  • Judge Dan Aaron Polster assigned to case, (W,Jo) (Entered: 10/05/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of Removal from Ashtabula County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2018CV0572 with jury demand, Filing fee paid $ 400, receipt number 0647-8944057.. Filed by U.S. Bank National Association and Portfolio Servicing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Notice of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit B, State Court Summons and Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Wallace, David) (Entered: 10/04/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.