This case was last updated from PACER on 01/27/2019 at 07:28:44 (UTC).

Blackstock v. Nebraska Department of Correctional Services et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2018 Blackstock filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Nebraska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pro Se Docket and Richard G. Kopf. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:18-CV-00555

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Nebraska District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Pro Se Docket

Presiding Judge

Richard G. Kopf

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jesse Blackstock

Tecumseh, NE 68450-0900

Defendants

Brad Hansen

United States of America

Nebraska Department of Correctional Services

 

Court Documents

21 #1

Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases

#21

(#21) JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's request for dismissal of this action (filing no. #19 ) is granted. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

#19

(#19) MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

#18

RESTRICTED

#17

(#17) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $51.13 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 10, 2019: initial partial filing feepayment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

#15

(#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Discover (filing no. #3 ) and Motion for Summons (filing no. #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (filing no. #5 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#14

(#14) *STRICKEN* MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.00 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 10, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) Modified on 12/12/2018 to strike per text order 16 (LKO). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#13

RESTRICTED

#4

(#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Discover (filing no. #3 ) and Motion for Summons (filing no. #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (filing no. #5 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#3

(#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Discover (filing no. #3 ) and Motion for Summons (filing no. #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (filing no. #5 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

#2

(#14) *STRICKEN* MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.00 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 10, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) Modified on 12/12/2018 to strike per text order 16 (LKO). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

1 #5

Exhibit 7

1 #4

Exhibits 4-6

1 #3

Exhibits 1-3

1 #2

Continuation of Complaint

1 #1

Continuation of Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Brad Hansen, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, and United States of America filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (no page 5) (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Complaint, #2 Continuation of Complaint, #3 Exhibits 1-3, #4 Exhibits 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7) (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) JUDGMENT - PRO SE - This case is dismissed without prejudice. Plaintiff is hereby notified that the filing of a notice of appeal will make him liable for payment of the full $505.00 appellate filing fee regardless of the outcome of the appeal. This is because the Prison Litigation Reform Act requires an incarcerated civil appellant to pay the full amount of the $505.00 appellate filing fee by making monthly payments to the court, even if he or she is proceeding in forma pauperis. 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). By filing a notice of appeal, Plaintiff will be consenting to the deduction of the $505.00 filing fee from his prison account by prison officials. (Attachments: #1 Notice - Civil Appeals in Pro Se Cases) Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's request for dismissal of this action (filing no. #19 ) is granted. This matter is dismissed without prejudice. A separate judgment will be entered in accordance with this Memorandum and Order. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 01/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) MOTION to Dismiss on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 01/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 12/20/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $51.13 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiffs institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 10, 2019: initial partial filing feepayment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiffs case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) TEXT STRIKE ORDER that Pursuant to NEGenR 1.3(a)(4), the Memorandum and Order #14 is stricken for the following reason: Filed in error. Ordered by Deputy Clerk. (LKO) (Entered: 12/12/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Discover (filing no. #3 ) and Motion for Summons (filing no. #4 ) are denied without prejudice to reassertion. Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction (filing no. #5 ) is denied. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) *STRICKEN* MEMORANDUM AND ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed IFP (filing no. #2 ) is granted. Plaintiff must pay an initial partial filing fee of $2.00 within 30 days, unless the court extends the time in which he has to pay in response to a written motion. After payment of the initial partial filing fee, Plaintiff's institution must collect the additional monthly payments in the manner set forth in 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2), quoted above, and forward those payments to the court. The clerk's office is directed to send a copy of this order to the appropriate official at Plaintiff's institution. The clerk's office is directed to set a pro se case management deadline in this case using the following text: January 10, 2019: initial partial filing fee payment due. Plaintiff is advised that, following payment of the initial partial filing fee, the next step in Plaintiff's case will be for the court to conduct an initial review of Plaintiff's claims to determine whether summary dismissal is appropriate under 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2). The court will conduct this initial review in its normal course of business. Ordered by Senior Judge Richard G. Kopf. (Copies mailed as directed) (LKO) Modified on 12/12/2018 to strike per text order 16 (LKO). (Entered: 12/11/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. ACCESS TO THE PDF DOCUMENT IS RESTRICTED TO CASE PARTICIPANTS AND THE COURT PURSUANT TO THE E-GOVERNMENT ACT AND FEDERAL RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 5.2(a). (LKO) (Entered: 12/10/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/7/2018: #1 Page 1) (LKO). (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) LETTER on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 12/07/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) SUPPLEMENT on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) GENERAL ORDER NO. 2016-02: This general order provides for the management and assignment of cases filed by a plaintiff or petitioner without counsel. This general order also includes the definition of the pro se docket, responsibilities of the pro se law clerks and scheduling and discovery requirements in pro se cases. Ordered by Chief Judge John M. Gerrard. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) LETTER by Clerk requesting plaintiff's trust account statement from institution. Letter sent to Bruce Hunzeker at the Nebraska Department of Correctional Services. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE by Clerk acknowledging receipt of complaint filed by a pro se party. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION/Praecipe for Summons on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MOTION for Praecipe Request for Transcripts Copy of Grievances, and Medical, & Institution Records on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis on behalf of Plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Brad Hansen, Nebraska Department of Correctional Services, and United States of America filed on behalf of pro se plaintiff Jesse Blackstock. (no page 5) (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Complaint, #2 Continuation of Complaint, #3 Exhibits 1-3, #4 Exhibits 4-6, #5 Exhibit 7) (LKO) (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.