This case was last updated from PACER on 07/10/2021 at 06:58:00 (UTC).

Blackfeet Tribe of The Blackfeet Indian Reservation v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/26/2018 Blackfeet Tribe of The Blackfeet Indian Reservation filed an Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act lawsuit against AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:18-OP-45749

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Racketeer Influenced & Corrupt Organizations Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

The Blackfeet Tribe of The Blackfeet Indian Reservation

Defendants

McKesson Corporation

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Purdue Pharma L.P.

Mallinckrodt LLC

Purdue Pharma, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd.

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Actavis, Inc.

TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

THE PURDUE FREDERICK COMPANY, INC.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc. n/k/a Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Mallinckrodt PLC

25 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Peter James Mougey

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor

316 South Baylen Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

Defendant Attorneys

Mark H. Lynch

Attorney at Covington & Burling - Washington

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Geoffrey E. Hobart

Attorney at Covington & Burling - Washington

One City Center, 850 Tenth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20001

Brien T. O'Connor

Attorney at Ropes & Gray - Boston

800 Boylston Street

Boston, MA 02199

Steven A. Reed

Attorney at Morgan, Lewis & Bockius - Philadelphia

1701 Market Street

Philadelphia, PA 19103

Ashley W. Hardin

Attorney at Williams & Connolly

725 Twelfth Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Charles C. Lifland

Attorney at O'Melveny & Myers - Los Angeles

400 South Hope Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Other Attorneys

Tara A. Fumerton

Attorney at Jones Day - Chicago

77 West Wacker

Chicago, IL 60601

Anthony J. Majestro

Attorney at Powell & Majestro

405 Capitol Street

Charleston, WV 25301

James C. Peterson

Attorney at Hill, Peterson, Carper, Bee & Deitzler

500 Tracy Way

Charleston, WV 25311

Michael J. Fuller, Jr.

Attorney at McHugh Fuller Law Group

97 Elias Whiddon Road

Hattiesburg, MS 39402

Archie Cleveland Lamb, Jr.

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor

316 South Baylen Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

J. Burton LeBlanc, IV

Attorney at Baron & Budd - Baton Rouge

2600 Citiplace Drive

Baton Rouge, LA 70808

Paul T. Farrell, Jr.

Attorney at Farrell Law

419 Eleventh Street

Huntington, WV 25701

Sandra K. Zerrusen

Attorney at Jackson Kelly - Akron

50 South Main Street

Akron, OH 44308

David R. Beasley

Attorney at Maynard Cooper & Gale - Huntsville

655 Gallantin Street

Huntsville, AL 35801

Brandon L. Bogle

Attorney at Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor

316 South Baylen Street

Pensacola, FL 32502

Jenny A. Hergenrother

Attorney at Alston & Bird - Atlanta

One Atlantic Center, 1201 West Peachtree Street

Atlanta, GA 30309

Carole S. Rendon

Attorney at Baker & Hostetler - Cleveland

127 Public Square

Cleveland, OH 44114

Eric R. Delinsky

Attorney at Zuckerman Spaeder - Washington

1800 M Street, Nw

Washington, DC 20036

13 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

#98

(#98) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. filed on behalf of Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation (Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

97 #1

Exhibit Waivers of Service

#97

(#97) Notice of Service of Waivers of Service filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waivers of Service)(Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

96 #1

Exhibit A.) Executed Waivers of Service

#96

(#96) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING WAIVERS OF SERVICE filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.) Executed Waivers of Service)(LeBlanc, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

#95

(#95) Notice by David R. Beasley of withdrawal as attorney filed by Defendant Associated Pharmacies Inc. (Beasley, David) Modified on 8/30/2019 (P,R). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#94

(#94) Attorney Appearance by Stewart James Alvis filed on behalf of Associated Pharmacies Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

#93

(#93) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (The Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation) filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.. Related document(s) #6 . (Morris, Sean) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

#7

(#7) Attorney Appearance by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Walmart, Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

#6

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#5

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#4

(#4) Attorney Appearance by Archie Cleveland Lamb, Jr filed by on behalf of Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

#3

(#6) SEALED Document:Corrected First Amended Complaint filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. Related document(s) #3 . (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

2 #1

Proposed Order

#2

(#3) Order granting #2 Motion filed by Plaintiff for leave to file their amended complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 8/3/2018.(B,R) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8776622. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action. Filed by The Blackfeet Tribe of The Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

147 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#99) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. Watson Laboratories, Inc. waiver sent on 8/8/2018, answer due 10/7/2018 filed on behalf of Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.) Executed Waivers of Service)(LeBlanc, J.) (Entered: 03/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#98) Waiver of Service Returned Executed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. filed on behalf of Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation (Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#97) Notice of Service of Waivers of Service filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waivers of Service)(Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#96) PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF FILING WAIVERS OF SERVICE filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A.) Executed Waivers of Service)(LeBlanc, J.) (Entered: 08/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#95) Notice by David R. Beasley of withdrawal as attorney filed by Defendant Associated Pharmacies Inc. (Beasley, David) Modified on 8/30/2019 (P,R). (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#94) Attorney Appearance by Stewart James Alvis filed on behalf of Associated Pharmacies Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 08/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#93) Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Plaintiffs Corrected First Amended Complaint and Jury Demand (The Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation) filed by Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.. Related document(s) #6 . (Morris, Sean) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#92) Answer to Plaintiff's Corrected First Amended Complaint (The Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation) filed by Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Related document(s) #6 . (Morris, Sean) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#91) Answer to #9 Amended complaint filed by Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Lifland, Charles) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#90) Answer to Plaintiff's Corrected First Amended Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allergan Finance, LLC. Related document(s) #6 . (Welch, Donna) (Entered: 07/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
83 More Docket Entries
  • 08/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Motion for leave to File Memorandum In Support of Motion to Dismiss Under Seal filed by AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., McKesson Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hobart, Geoffrey) (Entered: 08/31/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First Amended complaint (REDACTED) against All Defendants. Filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet to First Amended Complaint (Redacted)) (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/29/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Walmart, Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Attorney Appearance by Tara A. Fumerton filed by on behalf of Walmart, Inc.. (Fumerton, Tara) (Entered: 08/24/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) SEALED Document:Corrected First Amended Complaint filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. Related document(s) #3 . (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) SEALED Document:First Amended Complaint filed by Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. Related document(s) #3 . (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Attorney Appearance by Archie Cleveland Lamb, Jr filed by on behalf of Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Lamb, Archie) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Order granting #2 Motion filed by Plaintiff for leave to file their amended complaint under seal. Signed by Judge Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804) on 8/3/2018.(B,R) (Entered: 08/03/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Motion for leave to file Amended Complaint under seal filed by Plaintiff Blackfeet Tribe of the Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(LeBlanc, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Complaint with jury demand against All Defendants. Filing fee paid $ 400, Receipt number 0647-8776622. Plaintiff has indicated that case may be related to pending civil action. Filed by The Blackfeet Tribe of The Blackfeet Indian Reservation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Mougey, Peter) (Entered: 06/26/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Endo Health Solutions Inc. is a litigant